Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3064423

EP3064423 - HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE SYSTEM FOR A PEDAL-ASSISTED BICYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.08.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
23.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZEHUS S.p.A.
Corso Italia, 8
20122 Milan / IT
[2018/09]
Former [2016/36]For all designated states
Zehus S.r.l.
Corso Italia, 8
20122 Milan / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Corno, Matteo
Via Conte Rosso, 23
20134 Milan / IT
02 / Savaresi, Sergio Matteo
Largo Paolo Sarpi, 8
26100 Cremona (CR) / IT
03 / Berretta, Daniele
Via Turlough O'Carolan, 99
21042 Caronno Pertusella (VA) / IT
04 / Lisanti, Paolo
Via S. Carlo, 3
24040 Lallio (BG) / IT
 [2016/36]
Representative(s)Zermani, Umberto
Bugnion S.p.A.
Viale Lancetti, 17
20158 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2016/36]Fiorentino, Luca , et al
Gregorj S.r.l.
Intellectual Property
Via Muratori, 13 b
20135 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date16154851.609.02.2016
[2016/36]
Priority number, dateIT2015UB0000610.02.2015         Original published format: IT UB20150006
[2016/36]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3064423
Date:07.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:B62M6/45, B62M6/60
[2016/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/12]
Former [2016/36]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MENSCH-MASCHINE-SCHNITTSTELLENSYSTEM FÜR EIN PEDALUNTERSTÜTZTES FAHRRAD[2016/36]
English:HUMAN-MACHINE INTERFACE SYSTEM FOR A PEDAL-ASSISTED BICYCLE[2016/36]
French:SYSTÈME D'INTERFACE HOMME MACHINE POUR UNE BICYCLETTE ASSISTÉE À PÉDALES[2016/36]
Examination procedure09.02.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/12]
27.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2743165  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * figures 1-8 *;
 [I]WO2013155112  (BELON ENGINEERING INC [US]) [I] 1,14 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0033]; figure 2 *;
 [I]DE202013001348U  (ELECTRAIL UG HAFTUNGSBESCHRAENKT [DE]) [I] 1,14 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]WO2013124764  (UNI DEGLI STUDI DI BERGAMO [IT], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 7, line 23 - line 35; figures 1,7 *;
 [A]EP2471705  (J D COMPONENTS CO LTD [TW]) [A] 1-14 * figures 1,2; table 2 *