Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3072548

EP3072548 - DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  01.02.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HR, LV, NL, RS
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amgen, Inc
One Amgen Center Drive
Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US
[2016/39]
Inventor(s)01 / MEHTA, Dhairya
849 W. Orange Avenue, Apt. 3030
South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US
02 / TOY, Stephanie
15544 Borges Drive
Moorpark, CA 93021 / US
03 / RING, Lawrence
23408 Via Boscana
Valencia, CA 91355 / US
04 / TAMTORO, Ferry
4330 Via Cerritos
Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US
05 / CAIRNS, Alexander Stuart
1645 Centinela avenue, Apt. 4
Santa Monica, CA 90404 / US
06 / GIBSON, Robert Scott
12141 Bellando Court
Grenada Hills, CA 91344 / US
 [2019/10]
Former [2016/39]01 / MEHTA, Dhairya
849 W. Orange Avenue, Apt. 3030
South San Francisco, CA California 94080 / US
02 / TOY, Stephanie
15544 Borges Drive
Moorpark, CA California 93021 / US
03 / RING, Lawrence
23408 Via Boscana
Valencia, CA California 91355 / US
04 / TAMTORO, Ferry
4330 Via Cerritos
Newbury Park, CA California 91320 / US
05 / CAIRNS, Alexander Stuart
1645 Centinela avenue, Apt. 4
Santa Monica, CA California 90404 / US
06 / GIBSON, Robert Scott
12141 Bellando Court
Grenada Hills, CA California 91344 / US
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2016/39]
Application number, filing date16155465.420.11.2013
[2016/39]
Priority number, dateUS201261729303P21.11.2012         Original published format: US 201261729303 P
US201361774567P07.03.2013         Original published format: US 201361774567 P
[2016/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3072548
Date:28.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3072548
Date:06.03.2019
Language:EN
[2019/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/19, A61M5/32, A61M5/20, A61M5/158, A61M25/02, A61M5/14, A61M5/40, A61M5/31, C07K14/535, A61K9/00, A61M5/142, A61M5/30, A61M25/06, C12N9/64, A61K38/28, A61M5/42, A61M25/00, A61K38/26
[2018/40]
Former International [2016/39]A61M5/32, A61M5/20, A61M5/42, A61M5/14, A61M5/30, A61M5/158, A61M5/31, A61M25/02, A61M25/00, A61M25/06, A61M5/142, C07K16/40, A61K38/00, C12N9/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/18]
Former [2016/39]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG[2016/39]
English:DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE[2016/39]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENTS[2016/39]
Examination procedure12.02.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/18]
02.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2019Fee for grant paid
18.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13802787.5  / EP2922590
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI06.03.2019
HR06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
LV06.03.2019
NL06.03.2019
RS06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/38]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
BG06.06.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
GR07.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
SE06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI06.03.2019
LT06.03.2019
NO06.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2006032689  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-14 * figure 14B *;
 [Y]WO2009158655  (CALIBRA MEDICAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * figures 7,8,19,20 *;
 [Y]WO2007128121  (INST RECH S CLINIQUES DE MONTR [CA], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract *
by applicantUS4703008
 US5441868
 US5547933
 US5618698
 US5621080
 US5756349
 US5767078
 US5773569
 US5955422
 US5986047
 US6583272
 US7084245
 US7271689
 WO9105867
 WO9505465
 WO9640772
 WO0024893
 WO0181405
 WO2007136752
 US5830851
 US5856298
 US6030086
 US6310078
 US6391633
 US6586398
 US6900292
 US6750369
 US7030226
 US7217689
 US2002155998
 US2003077753
 US2003082749
 US2003143202
 US2004009902
 US2004071694
 US2004091961
 US2004143857
 US2004157293
 US2004175379
 US2004175824
 US2004229318
 US2004248815
 US2004266690
 US2005019914
 US2005026834
 US2005096461
 US2005107297
 US2005107591
 US2005124045
 US2005124564
 US2005137329
 US2005142642
 US2005143292
 US2005153879
 US2005158822
 US2005158832
 US2005170457
 US2005181359
 US2005181482
 US2005192211
 US2005202538
 US2005227289
 US2005244409
 US2006088906
 US2006111279
 WO9966054
 WO0061637
 WO0136489
 WO0214356
 WO0219963
 WO0220034
 WO0249673
 WO02085940
 WO03029291
 WO03055526
 WO03084477
 WO03094858
 WO2004002417
 WO2004002424
 WO2004009627
 WO2004024761
 WO2004033651
 WO2004035603
 WO2004043382
 WO2004101600
 WO2004101606
 WO2004101611
 WO2004106373
 WO2004018667
 WO2005001025
 WO2005001136
 WO2005021579
 WO2005025606
 WO2005032460
 WO2005051327
 WO2005063808
 WO2005063809
 WO2005070451
 WO2005081687
 WO2005084711
 WO2005103076
 WO2005100403
 WO2005092369
 WO2006050959
 WO2006002646
 WO2006029094
 WO03002713
 US2004181033
 WO2004058988
 WO2005047331
 US2005112694
 US2004097712
 WO03057134
 US2003229023
 WO03030833
 US2005074821
 US6919426
 US5789554
 WO2006069202
 US2006040358
 US2005008642
 US2004228859
 WO2006138729
 WO2005016970
 WO2007012614
 WO2007000328
 WO2006013472
 WO2005058967
 WO03059951
 US2005084906
 US2005249728
 US2005186203
 US2004265307
 US2003235582
 US7037498
 US2005244408
 US2004086503
 US2005136063
 US2004018191
 US2004202655
 US8030547
 WO2008057457
 WO2008057458
 WO2008057459
 WO2008063382
 WO2008133647
 WO2009100297
 WO2009100318
 WO2011037791
 WO2011053759
 WO2011053783
 WO2008125623
 WO2011072263
 WO2009055783
 WO2012054438
 WO2010029513
 WO2011111007
 WO2010077854
 WO2012088313
 WO2012101251
 WO2012101252
 WO2012101253
 WO2012109530
 WO0131007
    - LU ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, pages 2856 - 2865
    - MALONEY ET AL., CANCER RES., (2003), vol. 63, pages 5073 - 5083
    - COHEN ET AL., CLINICAL CANCER RES., (2005), vol. 11, pages 2063 - 2073
    - THAKUR ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 36, pages 1107 - 1115