Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3050693

EP3050693 - MONITORING METHOD FOR MONITORING THE ENERGY REQUIREMENTS OF A PLASTIC EXTRUSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Windmöller & Hölscher KG
Münsterstrasse 50
49525 Lengerich / DE
[2016/31]
Inventor(s)01 / BACKMANN, Martin
Windmühlenstraße 23
49525 Lengerich / DE
02 / MIDDELBERG, Gerhard
Osterkamps Kamp 57
49525 Lengerich / DE
03 / BUSSMANN, Markus, Dr.
Carmer Straße 11
45147 Essen / DE
04 / MINNERUP, Jens
In der Emscherau 13
46149 Oberhausen / DE
 [2016/31]
Representative(s)Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
[2016/31]
Application number, filing date16156185.726.09.2013
[2016/31]
Priority number, dateDE20121011091113.11.2012         Original published format: DE102012110911
[2016/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3050693
Date:03.08.2016
Language:DE
[2016/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:B29C47/92, // B29C47/00, B29C47/08, B29C47/10
[2016/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/11]
Former [2016/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIE ÜBERWACHUNG DES ENERGIEBEDARFS EINER KUNSTSTOFF-EXTRUSIONSANLAGE[2016/31]
English:MONITORING METHOD FOR MONITORING THE ENERGY REQUIREMENTS OF A PLASTIC EXTRUSION SYSTEM[2016/31]
French:PROCEDE DE SURVEILLANCE DU BESOIN EN ENERGIE D'UNE INSTALLATION D'EXTRUSION DE PLASTIQUE[2016/31]
Examination procedure17.02.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/11]
31.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/35]
24.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/35]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13770462.3  / EP2919962
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3304865  (BATTENFELD EXTRUSIONSTECH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0265601  (WERNER & PFLEIDERER [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 34; figure 1 *
 [XY]  - PETER FISCHER, "Neue Wege - fà 1/4 r die Automatisierung der Rohrextrusion", KUNSTSTOFFBERATER,, (19850301), vol. 30, no. 3, pages 27 - 31, XP001354048 [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * page 27, column 1 * * page 28, column 3 * * page 29, column 1 - page 31, column 1 * [Y] 6-9
 [Y]  - KARL V H, "MESSEN, STEUERN UND REGELN AN BLASFOLIEN-EXTRUSIONSANLAGEN", KUNSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (19911001), vol. 81, no. 10, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 902 - 906, XP000297626 [Y] 7-9 * page 902, column 2 - page 903, column 2 * * page 904, column 2 * * page 905, column 2 - page 906, column 1 *
 [YA]  - MENGES G ET AL, "Prozeà analyse an einem Kautschukextruder", KAUTSCHUK + GUMMI KUNSTSTOFFE,, (19820901), vol. 35, no. 9, pages 733 - 746, XP001353790 [Y] 6 * page 733, column 2 * * page 734, column 2 * * page 736, column 1 - page 737, column 1 * * page 738, column 1 * * page 746, column 1 * [A] 1