blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3122001

EP3122001 - PROVIDING PERSONAL ASSISTANT SERVICE VIA MESSAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.08.2020
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.07.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2019/43]
Former [2017/04]For all designated states
Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DANIEL, Robert Franklin
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
02 / LEBRUN, Alexandre
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
03 / LANDOWSKI, Laurent Nicolas
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
04 / DEMIR, Deniz
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
05 / GOLDBERG, Jeremy Harrison
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
06 / BLANDIN, Willy
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
07 / TALMOR, Yoram
c/o Facebook, Inc.
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA California 94025 / US
 [2017/04]
Representative(s)Murgitroyd & Company
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/43]Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2017/04]Schröer, Gernot H.
Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte
Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Bankgasse 3
90402 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date16156333.318.02.2016
[2017/04]
Priority number, dateUS20151480907824.07.2015         Original published format: US201514809078
WO2015US4865304.09.2015         Original published format: PCT/US2015/048653
[2017/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3122001
Date:25.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3122001
Date:23.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.12.2016
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/58
[2019/20]
CPC:
H04L51/18 (EP); G06F16/3329 (EP); G06F16/3334 (EP);
H04L51/02 (EP); H04L51/214 (EP); H04M3/527 (EP);
H04M2203/655 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2017/04]H04L12/58, G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/35]
Former [2017/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:BEREITSTELLUNG VON PERSÖNLICHEN ASSISTENZDIENSTEN VIA NACHRICHTENÜBERMITTLUNG[2017/04]
English:PROVIDING PERSONAL ASSISTANT SERVICE VIA MESSAGING[2017/04]
French:FOURNITURE DE SERVICE D'ASSISTANCE PERSONNELLE PAR MESSAGERIE[2017/04]
Examination procedure18.02.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/35]
12.06.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2019Date of oral proceedings
24.05.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2019Fee for grant paid
16.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)24.07.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.02.2016
AL23.10.2019
AT23.10.2019
CY23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
DK23.10.2019
EE23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
IT23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
MC23.10.2019
MK23.10.2019
MT23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
SI23.10.2019
SK23.10.2019
SM23.10.2019
TR23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IE18.02.2020
LU18.02.2020
IS23.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
BE29.02.2020
CH29.02.2020
FR29.02.2020
LI29.02.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU18.02.2016
AL23.10.2019
AT23.10.2019
CY23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
DK23.10.2019
EE23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
IT23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
MC23.10.2019
MT23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
SI23.10.2019
SK23.10.2019
SM23.10.2019
TR23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IE18.02.2020
LU18.02.2020
IS23.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
BE29.02.2020
CH29.02.2020
FR29.02.2020
LI29.02.2020
Former [2021/12]AL23.10.2019
AT23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
DK23.10.2019
EE23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
IT23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
MC23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
SI23.10.2019
SK23.10.2019
SM23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IE18.02.2020
LU18.02.2020
IS23.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
BE29.02.2020
CH29.02.2020
FR29.02.2020
LI29.02.2020
Former [2021/07]AL23.10.2019
AT23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
DK23.10.2019
EE23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
IT23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
MC23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
SI23.10.2019
SK23.10.2019
SM23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IE18.02.2020
LU18.02.2020
IS23.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
CH29.02.2020
FR29.02.2020
LI29.02.2020
Former [2020/51]AL23.10.2019
AT23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
DK23.10.2019
EE23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
IT23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
MC23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
SI23.10.2019
SK23.10.2019
SM23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
LU18.02.2020
IS23.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
CH29.02.2020
LI29.02.2020
Former [2020/50]AL23.10.2019
AT23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
DK23.10.2019
EE23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
IT23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
MC23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
SI23.10.2019
SK23.10.2019
SM23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
LU18.02.2020
IS23.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/48]AL23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
DK23.10.2019
EE23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
IT23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
SK23.10.2019
SM23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
LU18.02.2020
IS23.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/38]AL23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
DK23.10.2019
EE23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
IT23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
SK23.10.2019
SM23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IS23.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/37]AL23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
DK23.10.2019
EE23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
SK23.10.2019
SM23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IS23.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/36]AL23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
DK23.10.2019
EE23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IS23.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/35]AL23.10.2019
CZ23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RO23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/34]AL23.10.2019
ES23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/32]AL23.10.2019
FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/25]FI23.10.2019
HR23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
RS23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/24]FI23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
IS24.02.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/23]FI23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
LV23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
PL23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
GR24.01.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/22]FI23.10.2019
LT23.10.2019
NL23.10.2019
SE23.10.2019
BG23.01.2020
NO23.01.2020
PT24.02.2020
Former [2020/21]NL23.10.2019
NO23.01.2020
Former [2020/20]NL23.10.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1677218  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [X]US2014129651  (GELFENBEYN ILYA [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2014280757  (TRAN BAO [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2821943  (ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES LTD [IE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.