blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3043179

EP3043179 - METHODS AND MEANS FOR TREATMENT OF OSTEOARTHRITIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Galapagos N.V.
Generaal de Wittelaan L11 A3
2800 Mechelen / BE
[2016/28]
Inventor(s)01 / BRYS, Reginald Christophe Xavier
Galapagos NV
Generaal De Wittelaan L11/A3
2800 Mechelen / BE
02 / NELLES, Luc
Galapagos NV
Generaal De Wittelaan L11 A3
2800 Mechelen / BE
03 / VANDEGHINSTE, Nick Ernest René
Galapagos NV
Generaal De Wittelaan L11/A3
2800 Mechelen / BE
04 / MILLE-BAKER, Blandine
Darwinweg 24
2333CR Leiden / NL
05 / TESSARI, Michela Angela
Galapagos BV
Zernikedreef 16
2333CL Leiden / NL
 [2016/28]
Representative(s)Bar, Grégory
Galapagos NV
IP Department
Generaal De Wittelaan, L11 A3
2800 Mechelen / BE
[2020/19]
Former [2016/28]Kurkin, Sergey
Galapagos NV
IP Department
Generaal De Wittelaan, L11 A3
2800 Mechelen / BE
Application number, filing date16156432.301.04.2010
[2016/28]
Priority number, dateUS20090211740P01.04.2009         Original published format: US 211740 P
[2016/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3043179
Date:13.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3043179
Date:06.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.2016
ClassificationIPC:G01N33/50, G01N33/68, C12N15/113
[2016/28]
CPC:
G01N33/6887 (EP,US); C12N15/1137 (US); A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP); A61P29/00 (EP); A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N15/113 (US); C12N15/1138 (US); G01N33/5032 (US);
C12N2310/14 (US); G01N2333/726 (EP,US); G01N2333/912 (EP,US);
G01N2333/9121 (EP,US); G01N2333/96486 (EP,US); G01N2333/96494 (US);
G01N2500/04 (EP,US); G01N2500/10 (EP,US); G01N2500/20 (EP,US);
G01N2800/105 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/09]
Former [2016/28]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON OSTEOARTHRITIS[2016/28]
English:METHODS AND MEANS FOR TREATMENT OF OSTEOARTHRITIS[2016/28]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET MOYENS DE TRAITEMENT DE L'ARTHRITE[2016/28]
Examination procedure19.02.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/09]
19.06.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
11.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
03.12.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2020Fee for grant paid
25.03.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10712085.9  / EP2414829
Opposition(s)09.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
11.01.2019Request for further processing filed
11.01.2019Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.01.2019Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
06.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.04.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
15.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2020Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.04.2010
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MK06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
[2024/22]
Former [2023/29]HU01.04.2010
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2023/24]AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2022/10]AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/50]AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/08]DK06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS06.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[AD]WO2004094636  (GALAPAGOS GENOMICS NV [BE], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 291 *;
 [XDI]WO2006040357  (GALAPAGOS NV [BE], et al) [XD] 1-12 * claims 1-29; table 4 * [I] 13-15;
 [A]WO2008014008  (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-69 *;
 [A]  - SARAH PORTER ET AL, "Dysregulated expression of adamalysin-thrombospondin genes in human breast carcinoma", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20040401), vol. 10, no. 7, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-0398-3, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 2429 - 2440, XP002617699 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-0398-3
 [A]  - DAVIDSON ROSE K ET AL, "Expression profiling of metalloproteinases and their inhibitors in synovium and cartilage", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH AND THERAPY, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20060719), vol. 8, no. 4, doi:10.1186/AR2013, ISSN 1478-6354, page R124, XP021020604 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar2013
by applicantUS3773919
 CA2012311
 WO9402595
 WO9518863
 WO9521931
 US5459127
 WO9617823
 WO9625508
 US5580859
 US5589466
 US5693622
 WO03020931
 US2003180258
 US2003198627
 US2004071660
 WO2004094636
 WO2006040357
    - SWIFT ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 38, pages 639 - 46
    - ORNITZ ET AL., COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (1986), vol. 50, pages 399 - 409
    - MACDONALD, HEPATOLOGY, (1987), vol. 7, pages 425 - 515
    - HANAHAN, NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, pages 115 - 22
    - GROSSCHEDL ET AL., CELL, (1984), vol. 38, pages 647 - 58
    - ADAMES ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 318, pages 533 - 8
    - ALEXANDER ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL, (1987), vol. 7, pages 1436 - 44
    - LEDER ET AL., CELL, (1986), vol. 45, pages 485 - 95
    - PINKERT ET AL., GENES AND DEVEL., (1987), vol. 1, pages 268 - 76
    - KRUMLAUF ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1985), vol. 5, pages 1639 - 48
    - HAMMER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 235, pages 53 - 8
    - KELSEY ET AL., GENES AND DEVEL., (1987), vol. 1, pages 161 - 71
    - MOGRAM ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, pages 338 - 40
    - KOLLIAS ET AL., CELL, (1986), vol. 46, pages 89 - 94
    - READHEAD ET AL., CELL, (1987), vol. 48, pages 703 - 12
    - SANI, NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 283 - 6
    - MASON ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 234, pages 1372 - 8
    - FELGNER, PROC. NATL. ACAD SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 7413 - 7
    - MACKEY ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 8027 - 31
    - SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1745 - 8
    - FELGNER; RINGOLD, NATURE, (1989), vol. 337, pages 387 - 8
    - WILSON ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1992), vol. 267, pages 963 - 7
    - WU; WU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1988), vol. 263, pages 14621 - 4
    - WILLIAMS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 2726 - 30
    - CURIEL ET AL., HUM. GENE THER., (1992), vol. 3, pages 147 - 54
    - WU; WU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 32
    - APPLETON CT; PITELKA V; HENRY J; BEIER F, "Global analyses of gene expression in early experimental osteoarthritis", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2007), vol. 56, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1002/art.22711, pages 1854 - 68, XP055084761

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.22711
    - BILLINGHURST, RC ET AL., "Comparison of the degradation of type II collagen and proteoglycan in nasal and articular cartilages induced by interleukin- and the selective inhibition of type II collagen cleavage by collagenase", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 664 - 672
    - BILLINGHURST, RC ET AL., "Enhanced cleavage of type II collagen by collagenases in osteoarthritic articular cartilage", J CLIN INVEST., (1997), vol. 99, doi:doi:10.1172/JCI119316, pages 1534 - 1545, XP002346150

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI119316
    - BOERNER. P; LAFOND, R; LU, WZ; BRAMS, P; ROYSTON, I, "Production of antigen-specific human monoclonal antibodies from in vitro-primed human splenocytes", J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 147, no. 1, pages 86 - 95
    - CAO, Z; XIONG, J; TAKEUCHI, M; KURAMA, T; GOEDDEL, DV, "TRAF6 is a signal transducer for interleukin-1", NATURE, (1996), vol. 383, pages 443 - 446
    - CHEN, CJ; BANERJEA, AC; HARMISON, GG; HAGLUND, K; SCHUBERT, M, "Multitarget-ribozyme directed to cleave at up to nine highly conserved HIV-1 env RNA regions inhibits HIV-1 replication-potential effectiveness against most presently sequenced HIV-1 isolates", NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1992), vol. 20, pages 4581 - 4589, XP002111362
    - CHOY EH; PANAYI GS, "Cytokine pathways and joint inflammation in rheumatoid arthritis", N ENGL J MED, (2001), vol. 344, no. 12, pages 907 - 16
    - CLEGG DO; REDA DJ; HARRIS CL; KLEIN MA; O'DELL JR; HOOPER MM; BRADLEY JD; BINGHAM CO 3RD; WEISMAN MH; JACKSON CG, "Glucosamine, chondroitin sulfate, and the two in combination for painful knee osteoarthritis", N ENGL J MED., (2006), vol. 354, no. 8, pages 795 - 808
    - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, (1985), page 77
    - DAHLBERG, L ET AL., "Collagenase-mediated cleavage of type II collagen is selectively enhanced in osteoarthritis cartilage and can be arrested with a synthetic inhibitor which spares collagenase-1 (MMP-1", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (2000), vol. 43, pages 673 - 682
    - FIRESTEIN GS, "Evolving concepts of rheumatoid arthritis.", NATURE, (2003), vol. 423, no. 6937, pages 356 - 61
    - GAO, X; HUANG, L, "Cytoplasmic expression of a reporter gene by co-delivery of T7 RNA polymerase and T7 promoter sequence with cationic liposomes", NUCL. ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2867 - 2872, XP000572618
    - HOOGENBOOM; WINTER, "By-passing immunisation : Human antibodies from synthetic repertoires of germline VH gene segments rearranged in vitro", J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(92)90894-P, pages 381 - 8, XP024020530

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(92)90894-P
    - KARIN M, "The beginning of the end: IkappaB kinase (IKK) and NF-kappaB activation", J BIOL CHEM., (19990924), vol. 274, no. 39, pages 27339 - 42
    - KASHANI-SABET ET AL., "Reversal of the malignant phenotype by an anti-ras ribozyme", ANTISENSE RES DEV, (1992), vol. 2, pages 3 - 15, XP000576012
    - LEE DM; WEINBLATT ME, "Rheumatoid arthritis", LANCET, (2001), vol. 358, no. 9285, doi:doi:10.1016/S0140-6736(01)06075-5, pages 903 - 11, XP004806356

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(01)06075-5
    - LIPINSKI CA; LOMBARDO F; DOMINY BW; FEENEY PJ., "Experimental and computational approaches to estimate solubility and permeability in drug discovery and development settings", ADV DRUG DELIV REV, (2001), vol. 46, doi:doi:10.1016/S0169-409X(00)00129-0, pages 3 - 26, XP001097746

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0169-409X(00)00129-0
    - "Chapter 4. Humanization of Monoclonal Antibodies", MARK; PADLAN, The Handbook of Experimental Pharmacology, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113
    - MARKS JD; HOOGENBOOM HR; BONNERT TP; MCCAFFERTY J; GRIFFITHS AD; WINTER G., "By-passing immunization. Human antibodies from V-gene libraries displayed on phage", J MOL BIOL., (19911205), vol. 222, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0022-2836(91)90498-U, pages 581 - 97, XP024010124

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(91)90498-U
    - MILSTEIN; CUELLO, "Hybrid hybridomas and their use in immunohistochemistry", NATURE, (1983), vol. 305, pages 537 - 9
    - MITCHELL, PG ET AL., "Cloning, expression, and type II collagenolytic activity of matrix metalloproteinase-13 from human osteoarthritic cartilage", J CLIN INVEST., (1996), vol. 97, pages 761 - 768
    - NEUHOLD LA; KILLAR L; ZHAO W; SUNG ML; WARNER L; KULIK J; TURNER J; WU W; BILLINGHURST C; MEIJERS T, "Postnatal expression in hyaline cartilage of constitutively active human collagenase-3 (MMP-13) induces osteoarthritis in mice", CLIN INVEST., (200101), vol. 107, no. 1, pages 35 - 44
    - O'DELL JR, "Therapeutic strategies for rheumatoid arthritis", N ENGL J MED., (2004), vol. 350, no. 25, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMra040226, pages 2591 - 602, XP002503052

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMra040226
    - PEI Y; TUSCHL T., "On the art of identifying effective and specific siRNAs.", NAT METHODS, (2006), vol. 3, no. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nmeth911, pages 670 - 6, XP055027555

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth911
    - SCHMIDT MR; PIEKOS B; CABATINGAN MS; WOODLAND RT, "Expression of a human coxsackie/adenovirus receptor transgene permits adenovirus infection of primary lymphocytes", JIMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 165, pages 4112 - 9, XP002942580
    - SHLOPOV, BV ET AL., "Osteoarthritic lesions. Involvement of three different collagenases", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1997), vol. 40, pages 2065 - 2074
    - SMOLEN JS; STEINER G., "Therapeutic strategies for rheumatoid arthritis", NAT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2003), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 473 - 88, XP003002361
    - TRAUNECKER A; LANZAVECCHIA A; KARJALAINEN K, "Bispecific single chain molecules (Janusins) target cytotoxic lymphocytes on HIV infected cells", EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, no. 12, pages 3655 - 9, XP000232579
    - VENTURA M; WANG P; RAGOT T; PERRICAUDET M; SARAGOSTI S, "Activation of HIV-specific ribozyme activity by self-cleavage", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, no. 14, pages 3249 - 55, XP000567886
    - WIELAND HA; MICHAELIS M; KIRSCHBAUM BJ; RUDOLPHI KA, "Osteoarthritis - an untreatable disease?", NAT REV DRUG DISCOV, (2005), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd1693, pages 331 - 44, XP055038228

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd1693
    - WU W; BILLINGHURST RC; PIDOUX I; ANTONIOU J; ZUKOR D; TANZER M; POOLE AR, "Sites of collagenase cleavage and denaturation of type II collagen in aging and osteoarthritic articular cartilage and their relationship to the distribution of matrix metalloproteinase 1 and matrix metalloproteinase 13", ARTHRITIS RHEUM, (200208), vol. 46, no. 8, pages 2087 - 94
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.