Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3061853

EP3061853 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SELECTIVELY TREATING A SURFACE OF A COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.03.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Biomet UK Healthcare Limited
Dorcan Industrial Estate
Murdock Road
Dorcan
Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HY / GB
[2016/35]
Inventor(s)01 / WILLIAMS, Andrew
c/o Biomet UK Healthcare Limited
Dorcan Industrial Estate
Murdock Road
Dorcan
Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HY / GB
02 / HOLLOWAY, Gethin
c/o Biomet UK Healthcare Limited
Dorcan Industrial Estate
Murdock Road
Dorcan
Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HY / GB
03 / STEPHENS, Lyndon
c/o Biomet UK Healthcare Limited
Dorcan Industrial Estate
Murdock Road
Dorcan
Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HY / GB
04 / LLOYD, David B.
c/o Biomet UK Healthecare Limited
Dorcan Industrial Estate
Murdock Road
Dorcan
Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HY / GB
05 / BYE, Richard
c/o Biomet UK Healthcare Limited
Dorcan Industrial Estate
Murdock Road
Dorcan
Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HY / GB
 [2016/35]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2016/35]
Application number, filing date16157962.829.02.2016
[2016/35]
Priority number, dateGB2015000343727.02.2015         Original published format: GB 201503437
[2016/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3061853
Date:31.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:C25D17/14, C25D11/02, C25D11/00
[2016/35]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/14]
Former [2016/35]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN BEHANDLUNG EINER OBERFLÄCHE EINER KOMPONENTE[2016/35]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SELECTIVELY TREATING A SURFACE OF A COMPONENT[2016/35]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE TRAITER SÉLECTIVEMENT UNE SURFACE D'UN COMPOSANT[2016/35]
Examination procedure29.02.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/14]
25.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US4377447  (BEDNARZ JOSEPH F [US]) [X] 1,2,5-8,15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 22-57 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 1 *;
 [X]US2540602  (THOMAS FRANK W ET AL) [X] 1-8,15 * column 1, lines 1-5; figure 3 * * column 6, line 35 - column 7, line 19 *;
 [X]US2002130034  (UZOH CYPRIAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0055] *