Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3048647

EP3048647 - SPIN TORQUE DRIVEN MAGNETIC TUNNEL JUNCTION (STT-MTJ) WITH NON-UNIFORM CURRENT PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2016/30]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Wei-Chuan
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
02 / KANG, Seung. H
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
03 / ZHU, Xiaochun
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
 [2016/30]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/30]Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
RGC Jenkins & Co.
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
Application number, filing date16158124.414.01.2011
[2016/30]
Priority number, dateUS2010068742614.01.2010         Original published format: US 687426
[2016/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3048647
Date:27.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01L27/22, G11C11/16, H01F10/32, H01L43/08, B82Y25/00, H01F41/32, H01L43/12, B82Y10/00
[2016/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/09]
Former [2016/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SPIN-TORQUE TRANSFER MAGNETISCHER TUNNELÜBERGANG (STT-MTJ) MIT UNGLEICHFÖRMIGEM STROMPFAD[2016/30]
English:SPIN TORQUE DRIVEN MAGNETIC TUNNEL JUNCTION (STT-MTJ) WITH NON-UNIFORM CURRENT PATH[2016/30]
French:JONCTION A EFFET TUNNEL MAGNETIQUE À TRANSFERT DE COUPLE DE SPIN (STT-MTJ) AVEC TRAJET DE COURANT NON-UNIFORME[2016/30]
Examination procedure01.03.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/09]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11702313.5  / EP2524396
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
01.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
01.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
01.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
08.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US6417561  (TUTTLE MARK E [US]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * * column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 33 * * column 3, line 35 - line 41 * * column 1, line 40 - line 42 * * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 34 * [A] 12 [Y] 9,13-15 [I] 2-8,11;
 [IY]US2005254287  (VALET THIERRY [US]) [I] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0025] - [0053] - [0070] * [Y] 9,13-15;
 [Y]US2007171694  (HUAI YIMING [US] ET AL) [Y] 9,13-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0027] *;
 [Y]  - CHIH-LIANG WANG ET AL, "Reduction in critical current density by tuning damping constants of CoFeB for spin-torque-transfer switching", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS D. APPLIED PHYSICS, IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20090607), vol. 42, no. 11, ISSN 0022-3727, page 115006, XP020158298 [Y] 9,13-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - CHUNG N L ET AL, "Effects of capping layer on the spin accumulation and spin torque in magnetic multilayers; Effects of capping layer", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS D. APPLIED PHYSICS, IOP PUBLISHING, BRISTOL, GB, (20091007), vol. 42, no. 19, doi:DOI:10.1088/0022-3727/42/19/195502, ISSN 0022-3727, page 195502, XP020163452 [Y] 9,13-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0022-3727/42/19/195502
 [T]  - SUN ET AL, "Magnetoresistance and spin-transfer torque in magnetic tunnel junctions", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20080114), vol. 320, no. 7, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.JMMM.2007.12.008, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 1227 - 1237, XP022511154 [T] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmmm.2007.12.008