blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3095958

EP3095958 - SYSTEM FOR THERMALLY SHIELDING A PORTION OF A GAS TURBINE SHROUD ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
General Electric Company
1 River Road
Schenectady, NY 12345 / US
[2016/47]
Inventor(s)01 / BOGARD, Justin
1000 Western Avenue
Lynn, MA Massachusetts 01904 / US
02 / SHAPIRO, Jason David
1000 Western Avenue
Lynn, MA Massachusetts 01904 / US
 [2016/47]
Representative(s)Openshaw & Co.
8 Castle Street
Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB
[2019/25]
Former [2016/47]Pöpper, Evamaria, et al
General Electric Technology GmbH
GE Corporate Intellectual Property
Brown Boveri Strasse 7
5400 Baden / CH
Application number, filing date16159096.308.03.2016
[2016/47]
Priority number, dateUS20151470838511.05.2015         Original published format: US201514708385
[2016/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3095958
Date:23.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3095958
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2016
ClassificationIPC:F01D5/08, F01D11/00
[2016/47]
CPC:
F01D5/08 (EP,US); F01D25/145 (CN); F02C7/24 (US);
F01D11/005 (EP,US); F01D11/08 (US); F01D25/08 (US);
F02C3/04 (US); F05D2220/32 (CN,US); F05D2240/11 (EP,US);
F05D2240/15 (US); F05D2260/231 (EP,US); F05D2300/6033 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/27]
Former [2016/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR THERMISCHEN ABSCHIRMUNG EINES ABSCHNITTS EINES GASTURBINENMANTELANORDNUNG[2016/47]
English:SYSTEM FOR THERMALLY SHIELDING A PORTION OF A GAS TURBINE SHROUD ASSEMBLY[2016/47]
French:SYSTÈME DE PROTECTION THERMIQUE D'UNE PARTIE D'UN ENSEMBLE D'ANNEAU DE CERCLAGE DE TURBINE À GAZ[2016/47]
Examination procedure08.03.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/27]
09.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2019Fee for grant paid
09.05.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.05.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19173649.5  / EP3543471
Opposition(s)03.06.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU08.03.2016
AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CY19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
MK19.06.2019
MT19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
IE08.03.2020
LU08.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/28]HU08.03.2016
AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CY19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
MT19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
IE08.03.2020
LU08.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2021/12]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
IE08.03.2020
LU08.03.2020
BE31.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2021/07]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
IE08.03.2020
LU08.03.2020
CH31.03.2020
LI31.03.2020
Former [2021/04]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
LU08.03.2020
Former [2020/50]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
MC19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/37]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SI19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/36]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/24]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
PL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
PT21.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/22]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
DK19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/17]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
TR19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/13]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
SM19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/12]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
IT19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
IS19.10.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/11]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
EE19.06.2019
ES19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
SK19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AL19.06.2019
AT19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RO19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
PT21.10.2019
Former [2020/09]AL19.06.2019
CZ19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2020/07]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
NL19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
BG19.09.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
LV19.06.2019
RS19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
GR20.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL19.06.2019
FI19.06.2019
HR19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
SE19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI19.06.2019
LT19.06.2019
NO19.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]US4573866  (SANDY JR JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 1,10 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]US2003165381  (FOKINE ARKADI [RU], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1; claim 2 *;
 [X]US2005129499  (MORRIS MARK C [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0038] , [0044] , [0045] , [0046]; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]EP1566521  (EAGLE ENG AEROSPACE CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10* paragraphs [0008] , [0013]; figures 9,18,20 *;
 [X]WO2014168804  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0053]; figures 2,3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.