blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3070620 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3070620



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 238
06.06.2019 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
29.05.2019 Closing of application Search / examination 1
28.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
28.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
28.05.2019 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
23.04.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
23.04.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
10.04.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
04.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
04.11.2016 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
04.11.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
04.11.2016 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
04.11.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
04.11.2016 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
04.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.10.2016 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
13.10.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
26.09.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
24.08.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.06.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 2
06.06.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
06.06.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
26.05.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
13.05.2016 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
10.05.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 104
08.03.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
08.03.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
08.03.2016 Claims Search / examination 6
08.03.2016 Description Search / examination 45
08.03.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
08.03.2016 Drawings Search / examination 15
08.03.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5