blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3070620


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.05.2019 Withdrawal of application published on  03.07.2019  [2019/27]
19.04.2019 First examination report
16.04.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
20.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.11.2016 Amendment by applicant
21.10.2016 Request for examination filed published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
21.10.2016 Change - designated states published on  23.11.2016  [2016/47]
19.08.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  21.09.2016  [2016/38]
09.03.2016 Change - representative