blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3070620 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201610160512 EP16159212



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9928281Global Dossier 27.03.2018B2
US2016275150 22.09.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514663819 20.03.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN105989194Global Dossier 05.10.2016A
Priority number Date
US201514663819 20.03.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3070620Global Dossier 21.09.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201514663819 20.03.2015