Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3070620

EP3070620 - LIGHTWEIGHT TABLE COMPARISON [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.05.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.05.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.07.2019  [2019/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
International Business Machines Corporation
New Orchard Road
Armonk, New York 10504 / US
[2016/38]
Inventor(s)01 / BOURBONNAIS, Serge
c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual
Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
02 / MIN, Hong
c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual
Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
03 / LI, Xiao
c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual
Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
04 / WIERENGA, Jonathan, William
c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual
Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
05 / LAU, Yat On
c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual
Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
06 / ZHOU, Xiang Wei
c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual
Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
 [2016/38]
Representative(s)Gascoyne, Belinda Jane
IBM United Kingdom Limited
Intellectual Property Law
Hursley Park
Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB
[2016/38]
Application number, filing date16159212.608.03.2016
[2016/38]
Priority number, dateUS20151466381920.03.2015         Original published format: US201514663819
[2016/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3070620
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30
[2016/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/47]
Former [2016/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERGLEICH LEICHTER TISCHE[2016/38]
English:LIGHTWEIGHT TABLE COMPARISON[2016/38]
French:COMPARAISON DE TABLE LÉGÈRE[2016/38]
Examination procedure13.10.2016Examination requested  [2016/47]
04.11.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
18.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5802528  (OKI BRIAN M [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 1, line 6 - line 44; figures 4a-4c * [I] 2-8,10-15;
 [A]US2012296883  (GANESH AMIT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0042] *;
 [A]  - YOON-YOUNG LEE ET AL, "Table-comparison prefetching in VIA-based parallel file system", 42ND. ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM ON FOUNDATIONS OF COMPUTER SCIENCE.(FOCS 2001). LAS VEGAS, OCT. 14 - 17, 2001; [ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM ON FOUNDATIONS OF COMPUTER SCIENCE], LOS ALAMITOS, CA : IEEE COMP. SOC, US, (20011011), doi:10.1109/CLUSTR.2001.959971, ISBN 978-0-7695-1390-4, pages 163 - 167, XP032234942 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CLUSTR.2001.959971
by applicantUS2012317134
 US2014372374