Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3216406

EP3216406 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING PARTS OF A MULTI-PART IMPLANT OR MULTI-PART OSTEOSYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.08.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.09.2018  [2018/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universität Basel
Petersgraben 35
4003 Basel / CH
[2017/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Stübinger, Stefan
Im Kirschgarten 35b
4102 Binningen, BL / CH
02 / Zillig, Timo
Pappelnweg 28B
4310 Rheinfelden, AG / CH
 [2017/37]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/37]
Application number, filing date16159953.511.03.2016
[2017/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3216406
Date:13.09.2017
Language:DE
[2017/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/68, A61F2/30
[2017/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON TEILELEMENTEN EINES MEHRTEILIGEN IMPLANTATS ODER EINER MEHRTEILIGEN OSTEOSYNTHESE[2017/37]
English:METHOD FOR PROVIDING PARTS OF A MULTI-PART IMPLANT OR MULTI-PART OSTEOSYNTHESIS[2017/37]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE PORTIONS D'UN IMPLANT EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES OU D'UNE OSTEOSYNTHESE EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES[2017/37]
Examination procedure14.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/36]
20.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/36]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2012330427  (YAREMCHUK MICHAEL J [US]) [X] 1-3,6-9,15 * figures 11A-11D * [I] 4,5,10-12,14;
 [XI]US2013289727  (RUDNICK JAMES J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,15 * paragraph [0043] * [I] 4,5,11,12,14;
 [A]US2015088142  (GIBSON LUKE ANDREW [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 26 *
by applicantUS6060641
 US2015018829
 WO2008051967