Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3182649

EP3182649 - A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR SIDEBAND SERVER MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  05.01.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wipro Limited
Doddakannelli
Sarjapur Road
Bangalore
560 035 Karnataka / IN
[2017/25]
Inventor(s)01 / GHOSH, Soumik
Flat 3
Novel Plaza
282A Purbachal
Kalitala Road, Kolkata
700078 West Bengal / IN
 [2017/25]
Representative(s)Finnegan Europe LLP
1 London Bridge
London SE1 9BG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/25]Finnegan Europe LLP
16 Old Bailey
London EC4M 7EG / GB
Application number, filing date16160020.011.03.2016
[2017/25]
Priority number, dateIN2015CHE672515.12.2015         Original published format: IN 6725CH2015
[2017/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3182649
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/24, H04L29/06, H04L29/08, // H04W4/00
[2017/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/06]
Former [2017/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR SEITENBANDSERVERVERWALTUNG[2017/25]
English:A METHOD AND A SYSTEM FOR SIDEBAND SERVER MANAGEMENT[2017/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE SERVEUR DE BANDE LATÉRALE[2017/25]
Examination procedure11.03.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.12.2017Examination requested  [2018/06]
30.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]US2007130481  (TAKAHASHI SHUTA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claims 1, 9 * * figures 1-4, 6 * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0047] *;
 [A]CN102902594  (UFIDA SOFTWARE CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 11; claim 1 *