23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
16.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.07.2023 [2023/29] |
02.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
11.02.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
28.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
14.01.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
29.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] |
08.10.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
16.07.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
11.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2021 [2021/28] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
21.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
14.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] |
10.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
23.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.05.2021 [2021/21] |
12.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
15.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] |
07.08.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
06.08.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.08.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.08.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.06.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.06.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
19.06.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
29.05.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
29.05.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
14.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.11.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.09.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.05.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.04.2018 |
First examination report |
|
16.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.01.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
05.01.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.01.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
05.01.2018 |
Change - designated states |
published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] |
19.05.2017 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
14.03.2016 |
Change - representative |
|