Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3069777

EP3069777 - METHOD FOR GAS CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATION OF AN ENANTIOMER MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.07.2017
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  07.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZHAW Zurich University for Applied Sciences
Einsiedlerstrasse 31
8820 Wädenswil / CH
[2016/38]
Inventor(s)01 / SPENGER, Benjamin
Im Staubeweidli 5
8820 Wädenswil / CH
02 / STOHNER, Jürgen
Seestrasse 256
8810 Horgen / CH
 [2016/38]
Representative(s)Schmauder & Partner AG Patent- & Markenanwälte VSP
Zwängiweg 7
8038 Zürich / CH
[2016/38]
Application number, filing date16160863.317.03.2016
[2016/38]
Priority number, dateCH2015000037417.03.2015         Original published format: CH 3742015
[2016/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3069777
Date:21.09.2016
Language:DE
[2016/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:B01D53/02, B01D53/04, B01J20/29, C07B57/00
[2016/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/34]
Former [2016/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR GASCHROMATOGRAPHISCHEN TRENNUNG EINES ENANTIOMERENGEMISCHES[2016/38]
English:METHOD FOR GAS CHROMATOGRAPHIC SEPARATION OF AN ENANTIOMER MIXTURE[2016/38]
French:PROCEDE DE SEPARATION PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE EN PHASE GAZEUSE D'UN MELANGE D'ENANTIOMERES[2016/38]
Examination procedure17.03.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time
17.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/34]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
17.07.2017Request for further processing filed
17.07.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.09.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
17.07.2017Request for further processing filed
17.07.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.08.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
17.07.2017Request for further processing filed
17.07.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.08.2017Decision despatched
17.07.2017Request for further processing filed
17.07.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
10.08.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
12.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[AD]DE4317139  (SCHURIG VOLKER PROF DR [DE]) [AD] 1-4 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 41 - line 55 * * claim - *;
 [I]JP2000329756  (HASEGAWA T CO LTD) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0011]; claim - *;
 [I]JP2005031091  (HASEGAWA T CO LTD) [I] 1-4 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012]; claim - *;
 [A]EP0407412  (MACHEREY NAGEL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 30 *;
 [A]  - SCHURIG V, "Separation of enantiomers by gas chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (20010112), vol. 906, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00505-7, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 275 - 299, XP004227666 [A] 1-4 * Absatz 3.3 insbesondere Seiten 281-283 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)00505-7
 [AD]  - MISCHNICK-LUBBECKE P ET AL, "Characterization of cyclomalto-hexaose and -heptaose derivatives by the reductive-cleavage method", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, PERGAMON, GB, vol. 187, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0008-6215(89)80003-5, ISSN 0008-6215, (19890415), pages 197 - 202, (19890415), XP026606742 [AD] 1-4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6215(89)80003-5
by applicantDE4317139
 US5198429
    - Z. JIANG; J. CRASSOUS; V. SCHURIG, "Gas-chromatographic separation of tri(hetero)halogenomethane enantiomers", CHIRALITY, (2005), vol. 17, no. 8, pages 488 - 93
    - V. SCHURIG; H. GROSENICK, "Preparative enantiomer separation of enflurane and isoflurane by inclusion gas chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (1994), vol. 666, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/0021-9673(94)80422-2, pages 617 - 625, XP026571144

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(94)80422-2
    - W. LI; H. L. JIN; D. W. ARMSTRONG, "2,6-Di-O-pentyl-3-O-trifluoroacetyl cyclodextrin liquid stationary phases for capillary gas chromatographic separation of enantiomers", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY A, (1990), vol. 509, no. 2, pages 303 - 324
    - D. WISTUBA; V. SCHURIG, "Enantio- and regioselectivity in the epoxidehydrolase-catalyzed ring opening of simple aliphatic oxiranes: Part I: Monoalkylsubstituted oxiranes", CHIRALITY, (1992), vol. 4, pages 175 - 184
    - P. MISCHNICK-LÜBBECKE; RALPH KREBBER, CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1989), vol. 187, pages 197 - 202