blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3162606

EP3162606 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE DRIVE OF A TRAILER OF A TRACTION VEHICLE TRAILER COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.04.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.11.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[2017/18]
Inventor(s)01 / Gugel, Rainer
Gässelacker 14
68723 Plankstadt / DE
02 / Böhm, Barbara
Hildastr. 14
69115 Heidelberg / DE
03 / Fritz, Norbert
Finkenweg 11
68549 Ilvesheim / DE
04 / Wiedhage, Horst
Kleinkarlbacher Str. 23B
67281 Kirchheim Wstr. / DE
 [2017/18]
Representative(s)Dehnhardt, Florian Christopher
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Straße 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[2017/18]
Application number, filing date16160944.117.03.2016
[2017/18]
Priority number, dateEP2015019145626.10.2015         Original published format: EP 15191456
[2017/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3162606
Date:03.05.2017
Language:DE
[2017/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3162606
Date:09.09.2020
Language:DE
[2020/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2017
ClassificationIPC:B60L15/20, B62D59/04, B60W20/10, B60W10/06, B60W10/08
[2020/14]
CPC:
B60L15/2045 (EP,US); B60K6/52 (US); B60L9/00 (US);
B60W10/06 (EP); B60W10/08 (EP); B60W20/10 (EP,US);
B62D59/02 (US); B62D59/04 (EP,US); B60L2200/28 (EP,US);
B60W2300/14 (EP,US); B60W2530/207 (EP,US); B60W2710/083 (EP);
B60Y2200/147 (EP); Y02T10/62 (EP); Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2017/18]B60K6/52, B60L15/20, B62D59/04, B60W20/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/50]
Former [2017/18]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANTRIEBSSTEUERUNG EINES ANHÄNGERS EINER ZUGFAHRZEUG-ANHÄNGER-KOMBINATION[2017/18]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE DRIVE OF A TRAILER OF A TRACTION VEHICLE TRAILER COMBINATION[2017/18]
French:PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'ENTRAINEMENT D'UNE REMORQUE D'UN COMBINE REMORQUE/VEHICULE DE TRACTION[2017/18]
Examination procedure17.03.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.11.2017Examination requested  [2017/50]
03.04.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.07.2020Fee for grant paid
27.07.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.07.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)10.06.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
18.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
17.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.03.2016
AL09.09.2020
CY09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
DK09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
MC09.09.2020
MK09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SI09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
IE17.03.2021
LU17.03.2021
BE31.03.2021
CH31.03.2021
LI31.03.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU17.03.2016
AL09.09.2020
CY09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
DK09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
MC09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SI09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
IE17.03.2021
LU17.03.2021
BE31.03.2021
CH31.03.2021
LI31.03.2021
Former [2023/27]HU17.03.2016
AL09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
DK09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
MC09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SI09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
IE17.03.2021
LU17.03.2021
BE31.03.2021
CH31.03.2021
LI31.03.2021
Former [2022/34]AL09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
DK09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
MC09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SI09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
IE17.03.2021
LU17.03.2021
BE31.03.2021
CH31.03.2021
LI31.03.2021
Former [2022/11]AL09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
DK09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
MC09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SI09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
IE17.03.2021
LU17.03.2021
CH31.03.2021
LI31.03.2021
Former [2022/09]AL09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
DK09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
MC09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SI09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
IE17.03.2021
LU17.03.2021
Former [2022/07]AL09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
DK09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
MC09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SI09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
IE17.03.2021
Former [2021/45]AL09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
DK09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
MC09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SI09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
Former [2021/37]AL09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
DK09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SI09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
Former [2021/36]AL09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SI09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
Former [2021/28]AL09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SK09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
Former [2021/25]AL09.09.2020
CZ09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
ES09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
IS09.01.2021
PT11.01.2021
Former [2021/23]CZ09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
SM09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
PT11.01.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ09.09.2020
EE09.09.2020
HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RO09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
PT11.01.2021
Former [2021/21]HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
PT11.01.2021
Former [2021/18]HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
NL09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
Former [2021/10]HR09.09.2020
LT09.09.2020
LV09.09.2020
PL09.09.2020
RS09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
Former [2021/09]LT09.09.2020
SE09.09.2020
BG09.12.2020
NO09.12.2020
GR10.12.2020
Former [2021/07]LT09.09.2020
NO09.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[X]DE10131935  (MERITOR HEAVY VEHICLE SYS LTD [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE102007051590  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] , [0020] *;
 [X]EP2394889  (IVECO SPA [IT]) [X] 1-10 * abstract *;
 [I]US2014278696  (ANDERSON NOEL WAYNE [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0072] - [0074]; figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.