EP3079015 - PHOTOMASK BLANK, RESIST PATTERN FORMING PROCESS, AND METHOD FOR MAKING PHOTOMASK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2016/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADACHI, Teppei Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. c/o New Functional Materials Research Center 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata / JP | 02 /
WATANABE, Satoshi Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. c/o New Functional Materials Research Center 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata / JP | 03 /
DOMON, Daisuke Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. c/o New Functional Materials Research Center 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata / JP | 04 /
MASUNAGA, Keiichi Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. c/o New Functional Materials Research Center 28-1, Nishi Fukushima Kubiki-ku Joetsu-shi, Niigata / JP | [2016/41] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2016/41] | Application number, filing date | 16161526.5 | 22.03.2016 | [2016/41] | Priority number, date | JP20150078459 | 07.04.2015 Original published format: JP 2015078459 | [2016/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3079015 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3079015 | Date: | 29.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/039, G03F1/80, G03F7/004, G03F7/038 | [2016/41] | CPC: |
G03F7/0382 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G03F7/038 (CN);
G03F1/40 (CN);
G03F1/50 (CN,KR,US);
G03F1/66 (KR);
G03F1/80 (EP,US);
G03F7/00 (CN);
G03F7/004 (CN);
G03F7/0045 (US);
G03F7/0046 (EP,US);
G03F7/039 (EP,US);
G03F7/09 (US);
G03F7/093 (US);
G03F7/11 (US);
G03F7/2059 (US);
G03F7/322 (US);
G03F7/36 (US);
G03F7/40 (US);
G03F7/405 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2016/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FOTOMASKENROHLING, RESISTSTRUKTURBILDUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER FOTOMASKE | [2016/41] | English: | PHOTOMASK BLANK, RESIST PATTERN FORMING PROCESS, AND METHOD FOR MAKING PHOTOMASK | [2016/41] | French: | ÉBAUCHE DE PHOTOMASQUE, PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE MOTIF DE RÉSERVE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE PHOTOMASQUE | [2016/41] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 28.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2016 | AL | 29.04.2020 | AT | 29.04.2020 | CY | 29.04.2020 | CZ | 29.04.2020 | DK | 29.04.2020 | EE | 29.04.2020 | ES | 29.04.2020 | FI | 29.04.2020 | HR | 29.04.2020 | LT | 29.04.2020 | LV | 29.04.2020 | MC | 29.04.2020 | NL | 29.04.2020 | PL | 29.04.2020 | RO | 29.04.2020 | RS | 29.04.2020 | SE | 29.04.2020 | SI | 29.04.2020 | SK | 29.04.2020 | SM | 29.04.2020 | BG | 29.07.2020 | NO | 29.07.2020 | GR | 30.07.2020 | IS | 29.08.2020 | PT | 31.08.2020 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 22.03.2016 | |
AL | 29.04.2020 | ||
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
MC | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SI | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
PL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SK | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
AT | 29.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2020 | ||
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
EE | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
DK | 29.04.2020 | ||
ES | 29.04.2020 | ||
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RO | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
SM | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 29.04.2020 | |
FI | 29.04.2020 | ||
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
NL | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
BG | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
RS | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
HR | 29.04.2020 | ||
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
LV | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
GR | 30.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 29.04.2020 | |
LT | 29.04.2020 | ||
SE | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
PT | 31.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 29.04.2020 | |
NO | 29.07.2020 | ||
IS | 29.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 29.08.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2008203452 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1-3,5,7,11-15 * paragraphs [0022] , [0026] , [0109] , [0134] , [0208]; examples 14-28; claim 10 *; | [A]EP2256551 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]EP2362267 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7,11-15 * paragraphs [0019] , [0062] - [0090] - [0097] , [0120] - [0132]; examples 11-27; claims 1,3,5,10 *; | [X]EP2492746 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7,11-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0090]; examples 1-15; claims 1,4,5,8,10 * | by applicant | EP0041780 | JPH10309449 | JP2001166476 | JP2002226721 | JP2004115630 | JP2005326833 | EP1621927 | JP2006048029 | JP2006078807 | JP2006140635 | JP2007204385 | JP2007204448 | US7288363 | JP2008108535 | JP2008111103 | JP2008133448 | EP2000851 | JP2008304590 | US7531287 | US7537880 | JP2010077404 | JP2010514161 | JP2012032762 | US8343694 | WO2014007299 | JP2014015550 | JP2014028759 | JP2014028760 | JP2014177407 | JP2015078459 | US9091918 | - PROC. SPIE, vol. 8522, pages 852200 - 1 |