EP3076291 - METHOD FOR ASSIGNMENT OF VERIFICATION NUMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 18.12.2024 [2024/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Germany GmbH & Co. KG Westring 222 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prosak, Bradley Alan 305 Avalon Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 02 /
Helpenstein, Thomas Von-Immelhausen-Str. 90 41515 Grevenbroich / DE | 03 /
Papenbreer, Rudolph Nueller Strasse 164 42115 Wuppertal / DE | 04 /
Khaniki, Mussa Tohidi Dasnoeckel 61 42329 Wuppertal / DE | 05 /
Machuletz, Norbert Sven-Hedin-Strasse 18 58300 Wetter / DE | 06 /
Heckel, Oliver Franz-Lenders-Strasse 14 50226 Frechen / DE | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/40] | Application number, filing date | 16161823.6 | 23.03.2016 | [2016/40] | Priority number, date | US201514673097 | 30.03.2015 Original published format: US201514673097 | [2016/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3076291 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3076291 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/445, G06F21/12, // G06F21/44, G05B19/042 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
G06F21/44 (EP,US);
G05B19/058 (US);
G06F21/121 (US);
G06F21/572 (EP,US);
G06F21/85 (EP,US);
G06F8/654 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2016/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZUORDNUNG VON ÜBERPRÜFUNGSNUMMERN | [2016/40] | English: | METHOD FOR ASSIGNMENT OF VERIFICATION NUMBERS | [2016/40] | French: | METHODE D'ATTRIBUTION DE NUMEROS DE VERIFICATION | [2021/52] |
Former [2016/40] | MÉTHODE D'ATTRIBUTION DE NUMÉROS DE VÉRIFICATION | Examination procedure | 23.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2021 | 30.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22155101.3 / EP4012557 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.05.2022 | AT | 25.05.2022 | BG | 25.05.2022 | CZ | 25.05.2022 | DK | 25.05.2022 | EE | 25.05.2022 | ES | 25.05.2022 | FI | 25.05.2022 | HR | 25.05.2022 | IT | 25.05.2022 | LT | 25.05.2022 | LV | 25.05.2022 | MC | 25.05.2022 | NL | 25.05.2022 | PL | 25.05.2022 | RO | 25.05.2022 | RS | 25.05.2022 | SE | 25.05.2022 | SI | 25.05.2022 | SK | 25.05.2022 | SM | 25.05.2022 | NO | 25.08.2022 | GR | 26.08.2022 | IS | 25.09.2022 | PT | 26.09.2022 | [2024/51] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
IT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
MC | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SI | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 25.05.2022 | |
AT | 25.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
CZ | 25.05.2022 | ||
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
EE | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RO | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
SK | 25.05.2022 | ||
SM | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
DK | 25.05.2022 | ||
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
IS | 25.09.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
PL | 25.05.2022 | ||
RS | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
HR | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
LV | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
BG | 25.08.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
GR | 26.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
NL | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 25.05.2022 | |
ES | 25.05.2022 | ||
FI | 25.05.2022 | ||
LT | 25.05.2022 | ||
SE | 25.05.2022 | ||
NO | 25.08.2022 | ||
PT | 26.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5920715 (HECKEL ANDREAS [DE], et al) [Y] 2,6 * column 2, line 36 - line 60 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 3 * * column 4, line 43 - line 53; figure 1 * * column 6, line 14 - line 22; figure 1 * * column 6, line 44 - column 67, line 110; figure 1 ** column 8, line 12 - line 25; figure 1 *; | [XY]WO2011082863 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 3, line 4 - line 11 * * page 10, line 19 - line 38; figure 1 * * page 15, line 12 - line 19; figure 2A * * page 16, line 23 - line 32; figure 3 * * page 21, line 13 - line 28; figure 6 * * page 24, line 24 - line 36 * * page 14, line 10 - line 19 * [Y] 2-6; | [XYI]US2014075197 (ALRABADY ANSAF I [US], et al) [X] 7,8,14,15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026]; figure 2 and 3 * * paragraph [0031] * [Y] 3-5 [I] 9-13 | Examination | EP1748336 |