EP3075507 - TRANSPORT VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/40] | TRANSPORT AUTOMOBILE | ||
[2017/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rombold & Gfröhrer GmbH & Co. KG Rittweg 1 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rombold, Albrecht Welzheimer Str. 24 70736 Fellbach-Oeffingen / DE | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Franz-Mayer-Str. 16a 93053 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | Glück Kritzenberger Patentanwälte PartGmbB Hermann-Köhl-Strasse 2a 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 16161981.2 | 23.03.2016 | [2016/40] | Priority number, date | DE201510104849 | 30.03.2015 Original published format: DE102015104849 | [2016/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3075507 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3075507 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B28C7/04, B28C9/04, B28C5/42, B60P3/16 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
B28C5/4231 (EP);
B28C5/422 (EP);
B28C5/4237 (EP);
B28C5/4258 (EP);
B28C7/0445 (EP);
B28C9/0463 (EP);
B60P3/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] |
Former [2016/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRANSPORTFAHRZEUG | [2016/40] | English: | TRANSPORT VEHICLE | [2017/31] | French: | VÉHICULE DE TRANSPORT | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/40] | TRANSPORT AUTOMOBILE | Examination procedure | 23.03.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 30.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2016 | AL | 24.01.2018 | CY | 24.01.2018 | DK | 24.01.2018 | EE | 24.01.2018 | FI | 24.01.2018 | HR | 24.01.2018 | LT | 24.01.2018 | LV | 24.01.2018 | MC | 24.01.2018 | MK | 24.01.2018 | MT | 24.01.2018 | NL | 24.01.2018 | PL | 24.01.2018 | PT | 24.01.2018 | RO | 24.01.2018 | RS | 24.01.2018 | SI | 24.01.2018 | SK | 24.01.2018 | SM | 24.01.2018 | TR | 24.01.2018 | IE | 23.03.2018 | LU | 23.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | BG | 24.04.2018 | GR | 25.04.2018 | IS | 24.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.03.2016 | |
AL | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
IE | 23.03.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
LU | 23.03.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 24.01.2018 | |
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19808306 (KILIAN [DE]) [A] 12-15 * column 3, lines 23-35 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 13 *; | [A]JP3203741B (UBE INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] *; | [A]WO2004078438 (ROMBOLD & GFROEHRER GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * * page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [IA]WO2004091878 (BEZZI FRANCESCO [IT]) [I] 12,13,15 * figures 1,2 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8, line 20 * * page 9, lines 4-25 * [A] 1-11,14; | [I]EP1773551 (INNOVATION HOLDINGS UK LTD [GB]) [I] 12,13,15 * figures 1-3 ** paragraphs [0042] , [0043] , [0045] , [0053] *; | [A]EP2239120 (ROMBOLD & GFROEHRER GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0019] * |