Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3081182

EP3081182 - INJECTION DEVICE FOR BIOLOGICAL TISSUE REPAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wiltrom Co., Ltd.
No.221, Sec. 1
Zhongxing Road
Zhudong Township
Hsinchu County 310 / TW
[2016/42]
Inventor(s)01 / Liang, Huang-Chien
No.2, Aly. 12, Ln. 236, Meizhicheng, Xiangshan
Dist.
300 Hsinchu City / TW
02 / Liao, Chun-Jen
No.151-6, Jiaxing St., Xinyi Dist.
100 Taipei City / TW
03 / Wang, Yu-Ming
5F., No.18-8, Fubei St., North Dist.
704 Tainan City / TW
04 / Tai, Hung-Yin
5F., No. 14, Ln. 281, Dongnan St., East Dist.
300 Hsinchu City / TW
05 / Chuang, Shih-Chang
No.9, Jingke Rd., Nantun Dist.
408 Taichung City / TW
06 / Tsai, Yung-Fang
No.9, Jingke Rd., Nantun Dist.
408 Taichung City / TW
 [2016/42]
Representative(s)Lang, Christian
LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei
Ingolstädter Straße 5
80807 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/42]Lang, Christian
LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei
IP Law Firm
Rosenheimer Straße 139
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date16162076.023.03.2016
[2016/42]
Priority number, dateUS201562136708P23.03.2015         Original published format: US 201562136708 P
[2016/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3081182
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3081182
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/88, A61B90/00, B01F7/00, B01F15/02, B01F15/06
[2016/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
Former [2016/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUR REPARATUR VON BIOLOGISCHEM GEWEBE[2016/42]
English:INJECTION DEVICE FOR BIOLOGICAL TISSUE REPAIR[2016/42]
French:DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DESTINÉ À LA RÉPARATION DE TISSUS BIOLOGIQUES[2016/42]
Examination procedure23.03.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/32]
16.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.05.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/44]
25.06.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2013190680  (BAROUD GAMAL [CA]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraphs 47-49 * * page 4, paragraphs 58-62 * * page 5, paragraph 77 - page 6, paragraph 85 * * page 9, paragraphs 122-124 * * figures 1, 3, 4, 8, 10, 20 * [Y] 9,11 [I] 4;
 [XI]US6033105  (BARKER DONALD [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,5 * column 6, line 20 - column 9, line 37 * * column 22, line 26 - column 24, line 15 * * column 26, line 56 - column 27, line 62 * * figures 1-3, 19-22 * [I] 4;
 [YA]US2013289571  (CLICK BRYAN [US] ET AL) [Y] 9 * page 1, paragraph 15 * * page 2, paragraph 21 - page 3, paragraph 28 * * figure 1 * [A] 1;
 [YA]US2004030345  (AURIN GARY DOUGLAS [US] ET AL) [Y] 11 * page 2, paragraphs 24-27 * * figures 2, 3 * [A] 1;
 [A]US2014163567  (LIN YING-TSO [TW] ET AL) [A] 1-5,7 * page 2, paragraphs 21-25 * * page 3, paragraph 28 - page 4, paragraph 32 * * figures 1A, 1B, 6 *;
 [A]US2013079786  (BONNIN FREDDY [FR] ET AL) [A] 1,3,6,9,10,13 * page 2, paragraph 27 - page 3, paragraph 46 * * figures 4-6 *;
 [A]US2011028980  (CLICK BRYAN A [US] ET AL) [A] 1,10 * page 2, paragraphs 25-29 * * figure 1 *