Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3056869

EP3056869 - DETECTING SENSOR AND TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.06.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.02.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.03.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Japan G.K.
3-5-8, Hisamoto
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 213-8535 / JP
For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
2-1-1, Minamiaoyama
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[2018/13]
Former [2016/33]For all designated states
Tyco Electronics Japan G.K.
3-5-8, Hisamoto
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki
Kanagawa 213-8535 / JP
For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
2-1-1, Minami-Aoyama
Minato-ku, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Minematsu, Takayuki
c/o Tyco Electronics Japan G.K., 3-5-8, Hisamoto
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8535 / JP
02 / Nakai, Takanori
c/o Tyco Electronics Japan G.K., 3-5-8, Hisamoto
Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 213-8535 / JP
03 / Fukamizu, Nobutaka
c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd.
1-4-1 Chuo
Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP
04 / Kitajima, Kyoji
c/o Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
2-1-1 Minamiaoyama
Minato-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
 [2016/33]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2016/33]
Application number, filing date16162339.203.09.2012
[2016/33]
Priority number, dateJP2011023598627.10.2011         Original published format: JP 2011235986
[2016/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3056869
Date:17.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3056869
Date:01.08.2018
Language:EN
[2018/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01D11/24, F16H59/70, G01B7/30, G01M17/007, G01D5/14, B29C45/14
[2016/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
Former [2016/33]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ERKENNUNGSSENSOR UND ÜBERTRAGUNG[2016/33]
English:DETECTING SENSOR AND TRANSMISSION[2016/33]
French:CAPTEUR DE DÉTECTION ET TRANSMISSION[2016/33]
Examination procedure24.03.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/13]
04.04.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.2018Fee for grant paid
25.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12843767.0  / EP2772728
Opposition(s)03.05.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
IE03.09.2018
LU03.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
CH30.09.2018
LI30.09.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/38]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
IE03.09.2018
LU03.09.2018
BE30.09.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/37]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SI01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
IE03.09.2018
LU03.09.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/33]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
IE03.09.2018
LU03.09.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/30]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
LU03.09.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/26]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
DK01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
SM01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/23]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
EE01.08.2018
ES01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
MC01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
SK01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/22]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
CZ01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RO01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/21]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
IT01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL01.08.2018
AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
LV01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/11]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
HR01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/10]AT01.08.2018
FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
PL01.08.2018
RS01.08.2018
SE01.08.2018
BG01.11.2018
NO01.11.2018
GR02.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/09]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NL01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI01.08.2018
LT01.08.2018
NO01.11.2018
IS01.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT01.08.2018