Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3151184

EP3151184 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ENERGY MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Formerunknown
Status updated on  15.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.12.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Varetika Pty Ltd.
30 St Georges Road
Preston VIC 3072 / AU
[2017/14]
Inventor(s)01 / DESAI, Aniruddha Anil
La Trobe University Centre for Technology Infusion
2 Research Avenue
Bundoora, Victoria 3086 / AU
02 / SINGH, Jugdutt
La Trobe University Centre for Technology Infusion
2 Research Avenue
Bundoora, Victoria 3086 / AU
 [2017/14]
Representative(s)Kay, Ross Marcel
Laudens
Blackwell House
Guildhall Yard
London EC2V 5AE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/14]Laudens
Blackwell House
Guildhall Yard
London EC2V 5AE / GB
Application number, filing date16162416.809.09.2010
[2017/14]
Priority number, dateAU2009090437009.09.2009         Original published format: AU 2009904370
[2017/14]
Previously filed application, dateWO2010AU0116009.09.2010
[2017/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3151184
Date:05.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06Q50/00, H02J3/14
[2017/14]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/14]
TitleGerman:STROMMANAGEMENTVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM[2017/14]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ENERGY MANAGEMENT[2017/14]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION D'ÉNERGIE[2017/14]
Examination procedure25.11.2016Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
05.12.2016Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted
deletedDeletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/14]
06.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10814801.6  / EP2476091
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
01.11.2017Request for further processing filed
01.11.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.11.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
01.11.2017Request for further processing filed
01.11.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.11.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL
01.11.2017Request for further processing filed
01.11.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.11.2017Decision despatched
01.11.2017Request for further processing filed
01.11.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.11.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
22.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
22.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
29.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201607   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2017
Documents cited:Search[I]WO03084022  (ROBERTSHAW CONTROLS CO [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2006142900  (ROTHMAN MICHAEL A [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2008136581  (HEILMAN LAYNE E [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - Seng W. Loke ET AL, "CONTEXT-AWARE PERVASIVE PERSUASIVE SYSTEMS FOR MANAGING WATER AND ENERGY USAGE, AND C02 EMISSIONS: MULTI-LEVELLED POLICIES, GOALS, AND AN EXPERT SYSTEMS SHELL APPROACH", (20080101), URL: http://www.pervasive2008.org/Papers/Workshop/w2-09.pdf, (20130410), XP055059017 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *