Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3117788

EP3117788 - UNI-PLANAR BONE FIXATION ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.10.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  14.07.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Synthes GmbH
Eimattstrasse 3
4436 Oberdorf / CH
[2017/03]
Inventor(s)01 / HARVEY, Dustin M.
63 Mitchell Drive
Pottstown, PA 19465 / US
02 / DEC, Brian
534 Summercroft Drive
Exton, PA 19341 / US
03 / KEYER, Tom
683 Normandy Court
West Chester, PA 19382 / US
 [2017/13]
Former [2017/03]01 / Harvey, Dustin M.
63 Mitchell Drive
Pottstown, PA 19465 / US
02 / Dec, Brian
534 Summercroft Drive
Exton, PA 19341 / US
03 / Keyer, Tom
683 Normandy Court
West Chester, PA 19382 / US
Representative(s)Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/03]Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
Application number, filing date16162864.903.11.2009
[2017/03]
Priority number, dateUS20080110704P03.11.2008         Original published format: US 110704 P
[2017/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3117788
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/70
[2017/03]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/33]
Former [2017/03]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:UNIPLANARE KNOCHENFIXATIONSANORDNUNG[2017/03]
English:UNI-PLANAR BONE FIXATION ASSEMBLY[2017/03]
French:ENSEMBLE FIXATION OSSEUSE PLANE[2017/03]
Examination procedure30.03.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1}
07.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2017Examination requested  [2017/33]
16.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09745263.5  / EP2376005
Request for further processing for:The application was refused due to failure to designate an inventor
11.11.2016Request for further processing filed
11.11.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.12.2016Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
30.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
13.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
14.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 10
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2008243185  (FELIX BRENT A [US], et al) [X] 1-4,14 * figures 11-13 * * paragraphs [0088] - [0090] * [A] 11 [I] 12,13;
 [XA]WO2008089096  (LANX INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12-14 * paragraphs [0048] - [0065]; figures 2,4 * * figure 19 * [A] 11;
 [XAY]US2007118123  (STRAUSBAUGH WILLIAM L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12-14 * figures 1-6 * * claim 5 * [A] 11 [Y] 5-10;
 [Y]US2005283157  (COATES BRADLEY J [US], et al) [Y] 5-10 * figures 23-26 *;
 [A]WO2008048953  (INNOVATIVE DELTA TECHNOLOGY LL [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 9A *