blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3076350

EP3076350 - WORKFLOW ACTIVITIES FOR SUPPRESSION OF DOCUMENTS INSIDE OF A PRINT JOB [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.03.2020
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.03.2020Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.04.2020  [2020/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2016/40]For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / LIEBELT, Linda Sue
c/o Ricoh Americas Corporation
6300 Diagonal Highway
Boulder, CO 80301-9270 / US
02 / LOTZ, Michael Glen
c/o Ricoh Americas Corporation
6300 Diagonal Highway
Boulder, CO 80301-9270 / US
03 / MANNING, Kyle P.
c/o Ricoh Americas Corporation
6300 Diagonal Highway
Boulder, CO 80301-9270 / US
04 / WALLER, Marquis G.
c/o Ricoh Americas Corporation
6300 Diagonal Highway
Boulder, CO 80301-9270 / US
 [2016/40]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/40]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
Application number, filing date16162865.630.03.2016
[2016/40]
Priority number, dateUS20151467548131.03.2015         Original published format: US201514675481
[2016/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3076350
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2016
ClassificationIPC:G06Q10/06, G06F3/12
[2016/40]
CPC:
G06F3/1263 (EP,US); G06F3/1203 (EP,US); G06F3/1211 (US);
G06F3/1265 (US); G06F3/1275 (EP,US); G06F3/1282 (EP,US);
G06F3/1288 (EP,US); G06Q10/06 (EP,US); G06F2206/1514 (EP,US);
G06F3/1264 (EP,US); G06F3/1274 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ARBEITSABLAUFAKTIVITÄTEN ZUR UNTERDRÜCKUNG VON DOKUMENTEN INNERHALB EINES DRUCKAUFTRAGS[2016/40]
English:WORKFLOW ACTIVITIES FOR SUPPRESSION OF DOCUMENTS INSIDE OF A PRINT JOB[2016/40]
French:ACTIVITÉS DE WORKFLOW POUR LA SUPPRESSION DE DOCUMENTS À L'INTÉRIEUR D'UNE TÂCHE D'IMPRESSION[2016/40]
Examination procedure30.03.2016Examination requested  [2016/40]
05.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.11.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2019
19.11.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/18]
19.11.2019Date of oral proceedings
19.11.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
09.12.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
11.12.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US2013155436  (GAERTNER JOSEPH P [US], et al);
 [X]US2014160521  (JAHN JANEEN E [US])
ExaminationUS2009244600
 US2014240745
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.