Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3059249

EP3059249 - ANTIBODIES BINDING TO PIVKA-II AMINO ACIDS 13-27 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABBOTT LABORATORIES
100 Abbott Park Road
Abbott Park, IL 60064-6008 / US
[2016/34]
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIMURA, Toru
278 Matsuhidai
Matsudo-city Chiba / JP
02 / DOWELL, Barry L.
197 Knightsbridge Drive
Mundelein, IL 60060 / US
03 / BELIGERE, Gangamani S.
34381 N. Bobolink Trail
Grayslake, IL 60030 / US
04 / RUAN, Qiaoqiao
2629 West Autumn Drive
Round Lake, IL 60073 / US
 [2016/34]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Thierschstrasse 11
80538 München / DE
[2016/34]
Application number, filing date16163679.009.03.2010
[2016/34]
Priority number, dateUS2009040136110.03.2009         Original published format: US 401361
[2016/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3059249
Date:24.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:C07K16/40, C12N5/16, G01N33/577, G01N33/574
[2016/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/15]
Former [2016/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ANTIKÖRPERBINDUNG AN PIVKA-II-AMINOSÄUREN 13 27[2016/34]
English:ANTIBODIES BINDING TO PIVKA-II AMINO ACIDS 13-27[2016/34]
French:ANTICORPS SE LIANT AUX ACIDES AMINÉS13 - 27 PIVKA-II[2016/34]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Examination procedure04.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/15]
18.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10709127.4  / EP2406287
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
08.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[I]JPH09249699  (FUJIREBIO KK) [I] 1-31 * claims 1-8 *;
 [A]EP0182495  (NEW ENGLAND MEDICAL CENTER INC [US]) [A] 1-31 * page 15 * * page 17, line 20; claims 1-7 *;
 [I]  - NARAKI T ET AL, "gamma-Carboxyglutamic acid content of hepatocellular carcinoma-associated des-gamma-carboxy prothrombin", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA. MOLECULAR BASIS OF DISEASE, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0925-4439(01)00107-7, (20020424), vol. 1586, no. 3, ISSN 0925-4439, pages 287 - 298, XP004353585 [I] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4439(01)00107-7
 [I]  - SUGIMOTO HIROYUKI ET AL, "Des-gamma-carboxy prothrombin (DCP) ratio, a novel parameter measured by monoclonal antibodies MU-3 and 19B7, as a new prognostic indicator for hepatocellular carcinoma.", LIVER INTERNATIONAL : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR THE STUDY OF THE LIVER FEB 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12640726, (200302), vol. 23, no. 1, ISSN 1478-3223, pages 38 - 44, XP002592031 [I] 1-31 * the whole document *
 [A]  - OWENS J ET AL, "Monoclonal antibodies against human abnormal (des-gamma-carboxy)prothrombin specific for the calcium-free conformer of prothrombin.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 25 NOV 1984 LNKD- PUBMED:6209271, (19841125), vol. 259, no. 22, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 13800 - 13805, XP002592032 [A] 1-31 * the whole document *
 [A]  - SEKIYA C ET AL, "CHARACTERISTICS OF THE PIVKA-II FOUND IN HEPATOCELLULAR CARCINOMA, INVESTIGATION USING MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES MU-3 AND 19B7", INTERNATIONAL HEPATOLOGY COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0928-4346(94)90063-9, (19940101), vol. 2, no. 5, ISSN 0928-4346, pages 277 - 284, XP000609836 [A] 1-31 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0928-4346(94)90063-9
by applicantUS5912120
 WO9005144
 WO0183525
 US5648260
 US5624821
 US2004018590
 US2002137134
 WO2005100584
 US5705330
 US5089424
 US5006309
 US5679377
 US5916597
 US5912015
 US5989463
 US5128326
 WO9915154
 WO9920253
 US4526938
 WO9105548
 WO9620698
 US4980286
    - LIEBMAN, THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (1984), vol. 310, no. 22, pages 1427 - 1431
    - FUJIYAMA, HEPATO-GASTROENTEROLOGY, (1986), vol. 33, pages 201 - 205
    - MARREO, HEPATOLOGY, (2003), vol. 37, pages 1114 - 1121
    - KOTEISH, J. VASE. INTERV. RADIOL, (2002), vol. 13, pages 185 - 190
    - YUEN, BEST PRACTICE & RESEARCH CLINICAL GASTROENTEROLOGY, (2005), vol. 19, pages 91 - 99
    - HERAI ET AL., JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL LABORATORY AUTOMATION, (2007), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 205 - 210
    - DURAZO ET AL., JOURNAL OF GASTROENTEROLOGY AND HEPATOLOGY, (2008), vol. 23, pages 1541 - 1548
    - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., CLIN. CHEM. LAB. MED., (2008), vol. 46, no. 3, pages 411 - 416
    - NARAKI, BIOCHEMICA AT BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (2002), vol. 1586, pages 287 - 298
    - DUROCHER ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 30, no. 2
    - MIZUSHIMA, S.; NAGATA, S., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 18, no. 17
    - TETIN, S.Y.; T. L. HAZLETT, "Optical spectroscopy in studies of antibody-hapten interactions", METHODS, (2000), vol. 20, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1006/meth.1999.0927, pages 341 - 361, XP004466890

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/meth.1999.0927
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, APPL. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. (USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - HIGGINS ET AL., CABIOS, (1989), vol. 5, pages 151 - 153
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546
    - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426
    - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883
    - HOLLIGER, P. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - POLJAK, R.J. ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1121 - 1123
    - Antibody Engineering, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (2001), page 790
    - KIPRIYANOV, S.M. ET AL., HUMAN ANTIBODIES AND HYBRIDOMAS, (1995), vol. 6, pages 93 - 101
    - KIPRIYANOV, S.M. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL, (1994), vol. 31, pages 1047 - 1058
    - KABAT ET AL., ANN. NY ACAD, SCI., (1971), vol. 190, pages 382 - 391
    - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 877 - 883
    - PADLAN, FASEB J., (1995), vol. 9, pages 133 - 139
    - MACCALLUM, J MOL BIOL, (1996), vol. 262, no. 5, pages 732 - 45
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 907
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, page 799
    - FOOTE; WINTER, J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 224, pages 487 - 499
    - J6NSSON, U. ET AL., ANN. BIOL. CLIN., (1993), vol. 51, pages 19 - 26
    - JONSSON, U. ET AL., BIOTECHNIQUES, (1991), vol. 11, pages 620 - 627
    - JOHNSSON, B. ET AL., J. MOL. RECOGNIT., (1995), vol. 8, pages 125 - 131
    - JOHNNSON, B. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1991), vol. 198, pages 268 - 277
    - GIEGE, R.; DUCRUIX, A. BARRETT, Crystallization of Nucleic Acids and Proteins, a Practical Approach, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1999), vol. 20, pages 1 - 16
    - HAMMERLING ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and T-Cell Hybridomas, ELSEVIER, (1981), pages 563 - 681
    - URLAUB; CHASIN, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220
    - R.J. KAUFMAN; P.A. SHARP, MOL. BIOL., (1982), vol. 159, pages 601 - 621
    - R. JEFFERIS, BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2005), vol. 21, pages 11 - 16
    - CO, M.S. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 30, pages 1361 - 1367
    - WALLICK, S.C. ET AL., EXP. MED., (1988), vol. 168, pages 1099 - 1109
    - WRIGHT, A. ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 2717 - 2723
    - SHIELDS, R. L. ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 26733 - 26740
    - UMANA ET AL., "Engineered glycoforms of an antineuroblastoma IgG1 with optimized antibody-dependent cellular cytotoxic activity", NAT. BIOTECH, (1999), vol. 17, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/6179, pages 176 - 180, XP002921620

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/6179
    - FRANK QUINN, The Immunoassay Handbook, (2001), pages 363 - 367
    - SHIRAHA, J. BIOL. CHEM., (20050225), vol. 280, no. 8, pages 6409 - 15
    - WU; WU, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 4429 - 4432
    - SEFTON, CRC CRIT. REF. BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 20
    - BUCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 507
    - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 574
    - RANGER; PEPPAS, J. MACROMOL. SCI. REV. MACROMOL. CHEM., (1983), vol. 23, page 61
    - LEVY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, page 190
    - DURING ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (1989), vol. 25, page 351
    - HOWARD ET AL., J. NEUROSURG., (1989), vol. 7 1, page 105
    - GOODSON, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138
    - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533
    - NING ET AL., "Intratumoral Radioimmunotheraphy of a Human Colon Cancer Xenograft Using a Sustained-Release Gel", RADIOTHERAPY & ONCOLOGY, (1996), vol. 39, pages 179 - 189
    - SONG ET AL., "Antibody Mediated Lung Targeting of Long-Circulating Emulsions", PDA JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (1995), vol. 50, pages 372 - 397
    - CLEEK ET AL., "Biodegradable Polymeric Carriers for a bFGF Antibody for Cardiovascular Application", PRO. INT'L. SYMP. CONTROL. REL. BIOACT. MATER., (1997), vol. 24, pages 853 - 854
    - LAM ET AL., "Microencapsulation of Recombinant Humanized Monoclonal Antibody for Local Delivery", PROC. INT'L. SYMP. CONTROL REL. BIOACT. MATER., (1997), vol. 24, pages 759 - 760
    - JOLIOT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 1864 - 1868
    - GOLDSPIEL ET AL., CLINICAL PHARMACY, (1993), vol. 12, pages 488 - 505
    - WU; WU, BIOTHERAPY, (1991), vol. 3, pages 87 - 95
    - TOLSTOSHEV, ANN. REV. PHARMACOL. TOXICOL., (1993), vol. 32, pages 573 - 596
    - MULLIGAN, SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 260, pages 926 - 932
    - MORGAN; ANDERSON, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 62, pages 191 - 217
    - MAY, TIBTECH, (1993), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 15 5 - 215
    - SAKAGUCHI, THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 174, pages 4485 - 4494
    - BAJAJ, J. BIOL. CHEM., (19820410), vol. 257, no. 7, pages 3726 - 3731
    - Methods in Enzymology, (1997), vol. 289, pages 198 - 221
    - TETIN ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 45, pages 14155 - 14165