Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3106113

EP3106113 - VESSEL SEALING INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Covidien LP
15 Hampshire Street
Mansfield, MA 02048 / US
[2016/51]
Inventor(s)01 / SHARP, Robert M.
4138 Amber Street
Boulder, CO Colorado 80304 / US
02 / ARTALE, Ryan C.
725 Gillaspie Drive
Boulder, CO Colorado 80305 / US
03 / MOUA, Tony
13006 Lowell Court
Broomfield, CO Colorado 80020 / US
 [2016/51]
Representative(s)Morgan, Marc
Maschio & Soames IP Limited
30 Carlton Crescent
Southampton SO15 2EW / GB
[2016/51]
Application number, filing date16163749.128.02.2013
[2016/51]
Priority number, dateUS20121341547108.03.2012         Original published format: US201213415471
[2016/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3106113
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/12, A61B17/03
[2016/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
Former [2016/51]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:GEFÄSSVERSIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2016/51]
English:VESSEL SEALING INSTRUMENT[2016/51]
French:INSTRUMENT D'OBTURATION DES VAISSEAUX[2016/51]
Examination procedure04.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13757413.3  / EP2822495
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
04.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
20.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2009240246  (DEVILLE DEREK DEE [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] - [0 67] , [ 160] - [0161] - [ 212] - [0213] * [Y] 5-10;
 [Y]US2009182327  (UNGER JEFF [US]) [Y] 5-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0015] - [0084] , [0 87] - [0088] - [ 140] - [0143] *;
 [Y]US2005107784  (MOSES MICHAEL C [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] - [0068] *;
 [A]US2008215048  (HAFNER DIETER [DE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2176479
 US4005714
 US4031898
 US5827274
 US5290287
 US5312433
 US4370980
 US4552143
 US5026370
 US5116332
 US5443463
 US5484436
 US5951549
 US2007179408
 US2012083827
    - "Studies on Coagulation and the Development of an Automatic Computerized Bipolar Coagulator", J. NEUROSURG., (199107), vol. 75,
    - "Automatically Controlled Bipolar Electrocoagulation - ''COA-C0R4P", NEUROSURG. REV., (1984), pages 187 - 190,