Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3070036

EP3070036 - STACKING DEVICE FOR FLAT OBJECTS STACKED ON EDGE AND CORRESPONDING MAIL SORTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.11.2018
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Solystic
152-160 avenue Aristide Briand
92220 Bagneux / FR
[2016/38]
Inventor(s)01 / HUGUES, Damien
2T Allée Joan Miro
26120 CHABEUIL / FR
 [2016/38]
Representative(s)Prugneau, Philippe
Cabinet Prugneau-Schaub 3 avenue Doyen Louis Weil Le Grenat - EUROPOLE
38000 Grenoble / FR
[2016/38]
Application number, filing date16164297.019.11.2012
[2016/38]
Priority number, dateFR2011006114405.12.2011         Original published format: FR 1161144
[2016/38]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3070036
Date:21.09.2016
Language:FR
[2016/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3070036
Date:17.01.2018
Language:FR
[2018/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:B65H31/06, B65H31/14, B65H31/18, B65H3/50
[2016/38]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/17]
Former [2016/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:STAPELVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLACHE GEGENSTÄNDE, DIE AUF KANTE GESTAPELT WERDEN, UND DAZUGEHÖRIGE SORTIERMASCHINE FÜR POST[2016/38]
English:STACKING DEVICE FOR FLAT OBJECTS STACKED ON EDGE AND CORRESPONDING MAIL SORTING MACHINE[2016/38]
French:DISPOSITIF D'EMPILAGE POUR OBJETS PLATS EMPILES SUR CHANT ET MACHINE DE TRI POSTAL CORRESPONDANTE[2016/38]
Examination procedure07.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/17]
21.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.10.2017Fee for grant paid
19.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12806534.9  / EP2788269
Opposition(s)18.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
08.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MC17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
[2019/33]
Former [2019/13]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SI17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
SM17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
CZ17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
SK17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
EE17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RO17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL17.01.2018
CY17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/43]CY17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
MT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
BG17.04.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/39]CY17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
LV17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
RS17.01.2018
GR18.04.2018
IS17.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
PL17.01.2018
GR18.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY17.01.2018
HR17.01.2018
LT17.01.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US3865365  (HARDIN WILLIAM WARNER ET AL) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6572094
 EP1306337
 JPS5936066
 JPH082779
 EP0659669
 US5393196