Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3069701

EP3069701 - WOUND DRESSING WITH INFLATABLE BLADDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.01.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.10.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2017/02]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
12930 IH-10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US
Former [2017/01]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265-9508 / US
Former [2016/38]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
12930 IH-10 West
San Antonio TX 78249-2248 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KAZALA, Richard Marvin, Jr.
c/o KCI Licensing Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
02 / LONG, Justin Alexander
c/o KCI Licensing Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
03 / WILKES, Robert Peyton
13538 Cresent Creek
San Antonio, TX 78231 / US
04 / KAUFFMAN, Carrie Ann
4327 Fig Tree Woods
San Antonio, TX 78249 / US
 [2018/11]
Former [2016/38]01 / KAZALA, Richard Marvin, Jr.
c/o KCI Licensing Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, Texas 78265 / US
02 / LONG, Justin Alexander
c/o KCI Licensing Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, Texas 78265 / US
03 / WILKES, Robert Peyton
13538 Cresent Creek
San Antonio, Texas 78231 / US
04 / KAUFFMAN, Carrie Ann
4327 Fig Tree Woods
San Antonio, Texas 78249 / US
Representative(s)Cordina, Kevin John
Simmons & Simmons LLP
CityPoint
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/11]CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
Former [2016/38]Cordina, Kevin John
Olswang LLP
90 High Holborn
London WC1V 6XX / GB
Application number, filing date16164739.129.05.2009
[2016/38]
Priority number, dateUS20080057807P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57807 P
US20080057808P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57808 P
US20080057798P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57798 P
US20080057802P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57802 P
US20080057803P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57803 P
US20080057800P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57800 P
US20080057797P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57797 P
US20080057805P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57805 P
US20080057810P30.05.2008         Original published format: US 57810 P
US20080121362P10.12.2008         Original published format: US 121362 P
US20090144067P12.01.2009         Original published format: US 144067 P
[2016/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3069701
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3069701
Date:14.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/00, A61F13/02, A61F15/00, A61H1/00, A61L15/60, A61M1/00
[2016/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/17]
Former [2016/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:WUNDVERBAND MIT AUFBLASBAREN BLASEN[2016/38]
English:WOUND DRESSING WITH INFLATABLE BLADDERS[2016/38]
French:PANSEMENT AVEC DES POCHES GONFLABLES[2016/38]
Examination procedure11.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/17]
18.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2018Fee for grant paid
23.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09770666.7  / EP2278948
Opposition(s)17.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
11.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
10.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
IE29.05.2018
LU29.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/19]AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
IE29.05.2018
LU29.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
LU29.05.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/12]AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SI14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
CH31.05.2018
LI31.05.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
DK14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/06]AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
MC14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
PT16.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AT14.03.2018
CY14.03.2018
CZ14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
SK14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/49]CY14.03.2018
EE14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
PL14.03.2018
RO14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/47]CY14.03.2018
ES14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
IT14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
NL14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
LV14.03.2018
SE14.03.2018
BG14.06.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
NO14.06.2018
GR15.06.2018
Former [2018/35]CY14.03.2018
FI14.03.2018
HR14.03.2018
LT14.03.2018
NO14.06.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2001029956  (ARGENTA LOUIS C [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0058]; figures 2,5-11 *;
 [Y]US4224945  (COHEN JONATHAN) [Y] 1-15 * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 26; figures 7,8 *;
 [A]US2007078366  (HAGGSTROM KURT [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *