Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3060028

EP3060028 - NETWORK ASSISTANCE FOR DEVICE-TO-DEVICE DISCOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.02.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Intel Corporation
2200 Mission College Boulevard
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
[2016/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Johnsson, Kerstin
3125 Alma Street
Palo Alto, CA California 94306 / US
02 / Venkatachalam, Muthaiah
16620 NW Paddington Dr.
Beaverton, OR Oregon 97006 / US
03 / Stojanovski, Alexandre Saso
6 villa Faucheur
75020 Paris / FR
 [2016/34]
Representative(s)Withers & Rogers
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/34]Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date16164831.613.06.2013
[2016/34]
Priority number, dateUS201261679627P03.08.2012         Original published format: US 201261679627 P
US20121371874518.12.2012         Original published format: US201213718745
[2016/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3060028
Date:24.08.2016
Language:EN
[2016/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W76/02, H04W48/16, H04W8/00
[2016/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/15]
Former [2016/34]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:NETZWERKUNTERSTÜTZUNG FÜR VORRICHTUNG-ZU-VORRICHTUNG-ENTDECKUNG[2016/34]
English:NETWORK ASSISTANCE FOR DEVICE-TO-DEVICE DISCOVERY[2016/34]
French:ASSISTANCE RÉSEAU DE DÉCOUVERTE DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF[2016/34]
Examination procedure12.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.02.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/15]
18.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13826478.3  / EP2880956
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
16.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 05
12.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 06
13.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2011258313  (MALLIK SIDDHARTHA [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,13,14 * paragraphs [0021] - [0038] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0058] * * figures 2,3 * [I] 4,12,15;
 [A]US2012157121  (LI GUANFENG [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0071] - [0072] * * figures 2,6 *
 [I]  - INTEL, "ProSe Use Case for Unidirectional D2D Communication", 3GPP DRAFT; S1-120065_FS_PROSE_OPERATOR MANAGED UNIDIRECTIONAL D2D, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120206), vol. SA WG1, no. Kyoto, Japan; 20120213 - 20120217, XP050574730 [I] 1-15 * Section 4.2 *
 [A]  - Gábor Fodor, "Design Aspects of Network Assisted Device-to-Device Communications", (20110501), pages 2 - 9, URL: http://www.ericsson.com/res/docs/2012/design-aspects-of-network-assisted-device-to-device-communications.pdf, (20130410), XP055059107 [A] 1-15 * pages 2-5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MCOM.2012.6163598