Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3095603

EP3095603 - PRINTING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING A PLURALITY OF INKING UNITS OF A PRINTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  26.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.10.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Windmöller & Hölscher KG
Münsterstrasse 50
49525 Lengerich / DE
[2016/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Gunschera, Frank
Im Erlengrund 16
49078 Osnabrück / DE
 [2016/47]
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[N/P]
Former [2016/47]Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
Application number, filing date16165024.713.04.2016
[2016/47]
Priority number, dateDE20151010812622.05.2015         Original published format: DE102015108126
[2016/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3095603
Date:23.11.2016
Language:DE
[2016/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:B41F5/18, B41F5/24
[2016/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/27]
Former [2016/47]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DRUCKMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHEN ZUR ANSTELLUNG MEHRERER FARBWERKE EINER DRUCKMASCHINE[2016/47]
English:PRINTING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING A PLURALITY OF INKING UNITS OF A PRINTING MACHINE[2016/47]
French:PRESSE ET PROCEDE DE REGLAGE DE PLUSIEURS SYSTEMES D'ENCRAGE D'UNE PRESSE[2016/47]
Examination procedure13.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/27]
16.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.01.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/52]
08.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2019/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP1478513  (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * [I] 2,3,5;
 [XI]EP0615841  (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]) [X] 1,4,6-12 * column 1, line 1 - column 4, line 7; figure 1 * [I] 2,3,5;
 [I]DE9208023U  (WINDMÖLLER & HÖLSCHER) [I] 1 * page 1, line 1 - page 8, line 8; figure 1 *;
 [I]US2010092743  (WARNER ALRICK VINCENT [US] ET AL) [I] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102008025993