blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3081358 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3081358



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 130
02.01.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
15.11.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
31.10.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.10.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.10.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
31.10.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
31.10.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
25.07.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
25.07.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
25.07.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
25.07.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
25.07.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 9
27.02.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
27.02.2018 Claims Search / examination 2
27.02.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.02.2018 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
20.12.2017 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
15.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.12.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.12.2017 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.08.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
18.08.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
11.08.2017 Examination started Search / examination 1
19.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
19.04.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.04.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.04.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
19.04.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
19.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.10.2016 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
21.09.2016 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
08.08.2016 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.08.2016 European search opinion Search / examination 3
08.08.2016 European search report Search / examination 2
08.08.2016 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Search started Search / examination 1
21.06.2016 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
14.06.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 22
14.04.2016 Abstract Search / examination 1
14.04.2016 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Claims Search / examination 2
14.04.2016 Description Search / examination 7
14.04.2016 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
14.04.2016 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 7