blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3081358


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019 [2019/26]
17.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.06.2019  [2019/25]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
09.11.2018 (Expected) grant published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
06.11.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
05.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
05.11.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
24.07.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
06.07.2018 Change - German title published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
06.07.2018 Change - English title published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
06.07.2018 Change - French title published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
01.06.2018 Change - German title published on  04.07.2018  [2018/27]
13.04.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.02.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
16.12.2017 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
31.08.2017 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.08.2017 First examination report
28.04.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
28.04.2017 Request for examination filed published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
28.04.2017 Change - designated states published on  31.05.2017  [2017/22]
19.04.2017 Amendment by applicant
16.09.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.10.2016  [2016/42]
15.04.2016 Change - representative