blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3081358 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201610239364 EP16165232



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9868841Global Dossier 16.01.2018B2
US2016304695 20.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201562148321 16.04.2015
US201615099863 15.04.2016
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN106046470Global Dossier 26.10.2016A
Priority number Date
US201562148321 16.04.2015
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP3081358Global Dossier 12.12.2018B1
EP3081358 19.10.2016A1
Priority number Date
US201562148321 16.04.2015