Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3081358

EP3081358 - METHODS TO REPROCESS CROSS-LINKED FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2016/42]METHODS TO REPROCESS CROSS-LINKED FOAM AND PRODUCT
[2018/32]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.11.2018
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.08.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS, SK
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inteva Products, LLC
1401 Crooks Road
Troy, MI 48084 / US
[2016/42]
Inventor(s)01 / LYONS, Kevin Mark
1401 Crooks Road
Troy, MI 48084 / US
02 / GASSMAN, Kenneth Alan
1401 Crooks Road
Troy, MI 48084 / US
03 / HE, Xinhua
1401 Crooks Road
Troy, MI 48084 / US
 [2016/42]
Representative(s)Delorme, Nicolas , et al
Cabinet Germain & Maureau
BP 6153
69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR
[2016/42]
Application number, filing date16165232.614.04.2016
[2016/42]
Priority number, dateUS201562148321P16.04.2015         Original published format: US 201562148321 P
[2016/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3081358
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3081358
Date:12.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.2016
ClassificationInternational:B29B17/00
[2016/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/22]
Former [2016/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERVERWERTUNG VON VERNETZTEM SCHAUM[2018/32]
English:METHODS TO REPROCESS CROSS-LINKED FOAM[2018/32]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE RECUPERATION D'UNE MOUSSE RETICULÉE[2018/32]
Former [2016/42]VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERVERWERTUNG VON VERNETZTEM SCHAUM UND PRODUKT
Former [2016/42]METHODS TO REPROCESS CROSS-LINKED FOAM AND PRODUCT
Former [2016/42]PROCÉDÉS DE RECUPERATION D'UNE MOUSSE RETICULÉE ET PRODUIT
Examination procedure14.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/22]
18.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.10.2018Fee for grant paid
31.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.10.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SK12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
IS12.04.2019
PT12.04.2019
[2019/39]
Former [2019/37]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
EE12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RO12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
SM12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/35]AL12.12.2018
CZ12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
PL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/34]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
IT12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/33]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
PT12.04.2019
Former [2019/30]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
NL12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/26]AL12.12.2018
ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/25]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
RS12.12.2018
SE12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
GR13.03.2019
Former [2019/23]ES12.12.2018
FI12.12.2018
HR12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
LV12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/22]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
BG12.03.2019
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/21]FI12.12.2018
LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Former [2019/20]LT12.12.2018
NO12.03.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO9213696  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9,11,14,15 * example 2 * [I] 4,6,10,12,13;
 [XI]EP2138292  (OLSSON NENNA [SE]) [X] 8,9,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0011] , [0012] , [0013] , [0014] , [0018] * [I] 12,13;
 [XAI]EP0749818  (AIN ENGINEERING KK [JP]; TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 8,9,11,14,15 * page 8, line 20 - line 24 * * page 5, line 11 - line 49 * [A] 1-7 [I] 12,13;
 [A]JP2000140794  (NIPPON KOKAN KK) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0020] , [0022] *