Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3082114

EP3082114 - DEVICE FOR HOLDING AND EXPELLING PACKAGES, PARTICULARLY OF MEDICINES OR THE LIKE, FROM AN INCLINED CHUTE OF A STORAGE CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.12.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Label Elettronica S.R.L.
Viale della Repubblica, 18
35010 Limena (PD) / IT
[2016/42]
Inventor(s)01 / RAMI, Enrico
Via del Giglio, 4
35133 Padova / IT
02 / RAMI, Margherita
Via Spiera, 5
35013 Cittadella PD / IT
 [2016/42]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/42]
Application number, filing date16165544.415.04.2016
[2016/42]
Priority number, dateIT2015PD0008317.04.2015         Original published format: IT PD20150083
[2016/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3082114
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.2016
ClassificationInternational:G07F11/28, G07F11/42, B65G47/88
[2016/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Former [2016/42]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM HALTEN UND AUSSTOSSEN VON VERPACKUNGEN, INSBESONDERE VON MEDIKAMENTEN ODER DERGLEICHEN AUS EINER GENEIGTEN RUTSCHE EINES LAGERSCHRANKS[2016/42]
English:DEVICE FOR HOLDING AND EXPELLING PACKAGES, PARTICULARLY OF MEDICINES OR THE LIKE, FROM AN INCLINED CHUTE OF A STORAGE CABINET[2016/42]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR MAINTENIR ET EXPULSER DES EMBALLAGES, EN PARTICULIER DE MÉDICAMENTS OU ANALOGUES, À PARTIR D'UNE GOULOTTE INCLINÉE D'UNE ARMOIRE DE RANGEMENT[2016/42]
Examination procedure15.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/20]
19.04.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2385000  (LABEL ELETTRONICA S R L [IT]) [I] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [IA]EP2404589  (YUYAMA MFG CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1 * figures 8,22 * [A] 2-6;
 [XI]EP2206662  (WILLACH GMBH GEB [DE]) [X] 1-3 * figures 5-8 * [I] 4-6