Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3078868

EP3078868 - THRUST SLIDE BEARING CONSTITUTED OF SYNTHETIC RESINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 02.10.2019  [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Oiles Corporation
2-70, Kounan 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
[2018/09]
Former [2016/41]For all designated states
Oiles Corporation
2-70, Kounan 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-0075 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / SAKAIRI, Yoshikazu
c/o Oiles Corporation Fujisawa Plant
8 Kirihara-cho
Kanagawa, 252-0811 / JP
02 / KANEKO, Ryohei
c/o Oiles Corporation Fujisawa Plant
8 Kirihara-cho
Kanagawa, 252-0811 / JP
03 / MORISHIGE, Kouichi
c/o Oiles Corporation Fujisawa Plant
8 Kirihara-cho
Kanagawa, 252-0811 / JP
04 / NAGASHIMA, Tsuyoshi
c/o Oiles Corporation Fujisawa Plant
8 Kirihara-cho
Kanagawa, 252-0811 / JP
05 / SHIDA, Mirai
c/o Oiles Corporation Fujisawa Plant
8 Kirihara-cho
Kanagawa, 252-0811 / JP
 [2016/41]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/09]J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2016/41]Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date16165657.407.12.2010
[2016/41]
Priority number, dateJP2009028222811.12.2009         Original published format: JP 2009282228
[2016/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3078868
Date:12.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3078868
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16C33/20, F16C33/10, F16C33/18, F16C17/04, B60G15/06, F16C17/18, F16C33/74
[2016/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Former [2016/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SCHUBGLEITLAGER AUS KUNSTHARZEN[2016/41]
English:THRUST SLIDE BEARING CONSTITUTED OF SYNTHETIC RESINS[2016/41]
French:PALIER COULISSANT À POUSSÉE CONSTITUÉ DE RÉSINES SYNTHÉTIQUES[2016/41]
Examination procedure15.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/41]
02.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.01.2018Fee for grant paid
11.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10835697.3  / EP2511549
Opposition(s)29.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
15.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
15.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
15.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
[2019/40]
Former [2019/13]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NL28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2009041052  (OILES CORP) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2050787  (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1548303  (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4787991  (MOROZUMI MITUHARU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH0452488B
 JPH021532B
 JPH026263B