Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3235453

EP3235453 - BONE PROCESSING GUIDING RAIL, ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE FIRST BONE PROCESSING GUIDING RAIL AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING RAIL SECTIONS OF A MULTIPART BONE TOOL GUIDING RAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.09.2018
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.10.2018  [2018/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universität Basel
Petersgraben 35
4003 Basel / CH
[2017/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Zillig, Timo
Pappelnweg 28B
4310 Rheinfelden, AG / CH
02 / Stübinger, Stefan
Im Kirschgarten 35b
4102 Binningen, BL / CH
 [2017/43]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/43]
Application number, filing date16166190.520.04.2016
[2017/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3235453
Date:25.10.2017
Language:DE
[2017/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/17
[2017/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/43]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KNOCHENBEARBEITUNGS-FÜHRUNGSSCHIENE, ANORDNUNG UMFASSEND ZUMINDEST EINE ERSTE KNOCHENBEARBEITUNGS-FÜHRUNGSSCHIENE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON SCHIENENABSCHNITTEN EINER MEHRTEILIGEN KNOCHENBEARBEITUNGS-FÜHRUNGSSCHIENE[2017/43]
English:BONE PROCESSING GUIDING RAIL, ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE FIRST BONE PROCESSING GUIDING RAIL AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING RAIL SECTIONS OF A MULTIPART BONE TOOL GUIDING RAIL[2017/43]
French:RAIL DE GUIDAGE DE PREPARATION D'OS, SYSTEME COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN RAIL DE GUIDAGE DE PREPARATION D'OS ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE SECTIONS DE RAIL D'UN RAIL DE GUIDAGE DE PREPARATION D'OS EN PLUSIEURS PARTIES[2017/43]
Examination procedure26.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/44]
12.06.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2018/44]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2002183760  (MCGOVERN MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * figures 5-7,10-13 * [A] 12 [I] 10;
 [XAI]GB2489033  (BIOMET UK HEALTHCARE LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * figures 4-12 * [A] 12 [I] 10;
 [XI]US5486180  (DIETZ TERRY L [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * figure 6 * [I] 10;
 [X]US2006122616  (BENNETT TRAVIS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10 * figures 8-17 *;
 [X]US2008234683  (MAY JUSTIN J [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8 * figure 3 *;
 [XA]US7182766  (MOGUL STUART [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * figures 1,2 * [A] 12
by applicantUS6060641