Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3088796

EP3088796 - PROFILE RAIL FOR POSITIONING OF LED MODULES IN SURFACE LIGHTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.06.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 08.05.2019  [2019/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tridonic Jennersdorf GmbH
Technologiepark 10
8380 Jennersdorf / AT
For all designated states
Tridonic GmbH & Co KG
Färbergasse 15
6851 Dornbirn / AT
[2017/42]
Former [2016/44]For all designated states
Tridonic Jennersdorf GmbH
Technologiepark 10
8380 Jennersdorf / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Schrottenholzer, Jan
Kaiser Franz Josef Str. 25b
6890 Lustenau / AT
02 / Riemer, Steffen
Krottendorf 346
8564 Krottendorf-Gaisfeld / AT
03 / Gründhammer, Stefan
c/o Tridonic Jennersdorf GmbH
Technologiepark 10
8380 Jennersdorf / AT
 [2017/04]
Former [2016/44]01 / Schrottenholzer, Jan
Kaiser Franz Josef Str. 25b
6890 Lustenau / AT
02 / Riemer, Steffen
Krottendorf 346
8564 Krottendorf-Gaisfeld / AT
03 / Gründhammer, Stefan
Gießelsdorf 137
8654 St. Anna am Aigen / AT
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2016/44]
Application number, filing date16166344.821.04.2016
[2016/44]
Priority number, dateDE201520102143U29.04.2015         Original published format: DE 202015102143 U
DE201520103732U16.07.2015         Original published format: DE 202015103732 U
[2016/44]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3088796
Date:02.11.2016
Language:DE
[2016/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3088796
Date:01.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2016
ClassificationInternational:F21S8/04, F21V19/00
[2016/44]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/10]
Former [2016/44]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:PROFILSCHIENE ZUR POSITIONIERUNG VON LED MODULEN IN FLÄCHENLEUCHTEN[2016/44]
English:PROFILE RAIL FOR POSITIONING OF LED MODULES IN SURFACE LIGHTS[2016/44]
French:RAIL PROFILE DESTINE AU POSITIONNEMENT DE MODULES A DEL DANS DES CONDENSATEURS LUMINEUX[2016/44]
Examination procedure21.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.01.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/10]
27.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.09.2017Fee for grant paid
05.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
IE21.04.2018
LU21.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
[2019/19]
Former [2019/12]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
LU21.04.2018
BE30.04.2018
Former [2019/08]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
LU21.04.2018
Former [2018/52]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/43]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/39]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/23]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[YA]US2008062691  (VILLARD RUSSELL GEORGE [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-12 * figure - * [A] 13-15;
 [Y]EP2543922  (THOMAS GMUER GMBH [CH]) [Y] 1-7,9-12 * figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]DE202009001162U  (THOMAS KOFFERATH FLIESENLEGERB [DE]) [Y] 1-7 * figures 1-3 *;
 [Y]DE102008056958  (MARQUARDT KERAMIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-8,11,12 * figure 1 *