Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3091716

EP3091716 - METHOD FOR ALLOCATING INTERNET PROTOCOL ADDRESSES TO CLIENTS OF A NETWORK AND CORRESPONDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.09.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Thomson Licensing
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[2016/45]
Inventor(s)01 / JEANNE, Ludovic
c/o Technicolor Connected Home Rennes
975, avenue des Champs Blancs
CS17616
35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR
02 / TEROL, José
c/o Technicolor Connected Home Rennes
975, avenue des Champs Blancs
CS17616
35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR
03 / GRAEF, Lucien
c/o Technicolor Connected Home Rennes
975, avenue des Champs Blancs
CS17616
35576 Cesson-Sévigné Cedex / FR
04 / VAN DER BOSSCHE, GEERT
c/oTechnicolor Delivery Technologies Belgium
Prins Boudewijnlaan 47
2650 Edegem / BE
 [2016/45]
Representative(s)Huchet, Anne , et al
InterDigital CE Patent Holdings
20, rue Rouget de Lisle
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
[N/P]
Former [2016/45]Huchet, Anne , et al
TECHNICOLOR
1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc
92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR
Application number, filing date16166982.526.04.2016
[2016/45]
Priority number, dateEP2015030569406.05.2015         Original published format: EP 15305694
[2016/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3091716
Date:09.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3091716
Date:28.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/12
[2016/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/22]
Former [2016/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ZUWEISUNG VON INTERNETPROTOKOLLADRESSEN ZU CLIENTS EINES NETZWERKS UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG[2016/45]
English:METHOD FOR ALLOCATING INTERNET PROTOCOL ADDRESSES TO CLIENTS OF A NETWORK AND CORRESPONDING APPARATUS[2016/45]
French:PROCEDE POUR ATTRIBUER DES ADRESSES DE PROTOCOLE INTERNET A DES CLIENTS D'UN RESEAU ET APPAREIL CORRESPONDANT[2016/45]
Examination procedure26.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/22]
12.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.01.2018Fee for grant paid
09.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)29.11.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/06]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
IE26.04.2018
LU26.04.2018
MT26.04.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/19]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
IE26.04.2018
LU26.04.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2019/13]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SI28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
LU26.04.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2019/08]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
LU26.04.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
MC28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
SM28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
DK28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
CZ28.02.2018
EE28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
PL28.02.2018
RO28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
SK28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL28.02.2018
AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
BG28.05.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT28.02.2018
CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
LV28.02.2018
RS28.02.2018
SE28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
GR29.05.2018
Former [2018/36]CY28.02.2018
ES28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Former [2018/35]CY28.02.2018
FI28.02.2018
HR28.02.2018
LT28.02.2018
NO28.05.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008008192  (MATOBA KAZUMINE [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0024] *;
 [A]  - Anonymous, "[Knowledge Base] Pharos MAXtream introduction", (20150505), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://forum.tp-link.com/showthread.php?78930-Pharos-MAXtream-introduction&p=156842&viewfull=1#post156842, (20151014), XP055220762 [A] 1-16 * page 4 - page 6 *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "HELPMESOLVE.IT - WN2500RP and Wireless Card Access Lists", (20120415), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.helpmesolve.it/answers/578/wn2500rp+and+wireless+card+access+lists.html, (20151014), XP055220837 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "NETGEAR AC1200 Wifi Range Extender Model EX6200 user Manual", (201501), pages 1-5 - 115-118, URL: http://www.downloads.netgear.com/files/GDC/EX6200/EX6200_UM_09Jan2015.pdf, (20151014), XP002746376 [A] 1-16 * page 115 - page 118 *
 [A]  - BEGLEY M, "The public ethernet network: The next-generation broadband access network", ANNUAL REVIEW OF COMMUNICATIONS, NATIONAL ENGINEERING CONSORTIUM, CHICAGO, IL, US, (20040101), vol. 57, ISSN 0886-229X, pages 531 - 539, XP001520617 [A] 1-16 * Chapter 2.3. *