EP3075935 - RETRACTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Simon GmbH & Co. KG Sulgener Str. 19 - 23 78733 Aichhalden / DE | [2016/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bantle, Ulrich Horber Str. 22 72186 Empfingen / DE | 02 /
Eschle, Jürgen Waldmössinger Str. 17 78733 Aichhalden / DE | [2016/40] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Jochen, et al Herrmann Patentanwälte Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/40] | Herrmann, Jochen, et al Herrmann Patentanwälte Königstrasse 30 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 16168069.9 | 08.10.2009 | [2016/40] | Priority number, date | DE20081051360 | 15.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008051360 | [2016/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3075935 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3075935 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E05F5/02, E05F1/16, A47B88/467, E05F5/00 | [2017/47] | CPC: |
E05F5/003 (EP);
A47B88/467 (EP);
E05F1/16 (EP);
A47B2210/0094 (EP);
E05Y2201/21 (EP);
E05Y2201/256 (EP);
E05Y2201/264 (EP);
E05Y2800/21 (EP);
E05Y2800/24 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/40] | E05F1/08, E05F5/00, E05F5/02, A47B88/04, E05F1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2016/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINZUGVORRICHTUNG | [2016/40] | English: | RETRACTING DEVICE | [2016/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION | [2016/40] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 17.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09736146.3 / EP2334884 | EP12005104.0 / EP2527578 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2019
14.10.2019
WITHDRAWN Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co.KG Industriestrasse 83-87 32139 Spenge / DE Opponent's representative DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2019
14.10.2019
WITHDRAWN Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co.KG Industriestrasse 83-87 32139 Spenge / DE Opponent's representative DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2019/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2019
06.02.2019
ADMISSIBLE Hettich-Heinze GmbH & Co.KG Industriestrasse 83-87 32139 Spenge / DE Opponent's representative DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Marstallstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | 18.02.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.06.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 08.11.2019 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2009 | CY | 02.05.2018 | DK | 02.05.2018 | EE | 02.05.2018 | FI | 02.05.2018 | HR | 02.05.2018 | LT | 02.05.2018 | LV | 02.05.2018 | MC | 02.05.2018 | MK | 02.05.2018 | MT | 02.05.2018 | NL | 02.05.2018 | PT | 02.05.2018 | RO | 02.05.2018 | SE | 02.05.2018 | SI | 02.05.2018 | SM | 02.05.2018 | BG | 02.08.2018 | NO | 02.08.2018 | GR | 03.08.2018 | IS | 02.09.2018 | AT | 08.10.2018 | IE | 08.10.2018 | LU | 08.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.10.2009 | |
CY | 02.05.2018 | ||
DK | 02.05.2018 | ||
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MK | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
PT | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/10] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
AT | 08.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
MT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
MC | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SI | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
RO | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
SM | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
EE | 02.05.2018 | ||
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 02.05.2018 | |
FI | 02.05.2018 | ||
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
NL | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
GR | 03.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
LV | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
HR | 02.05.2018 | ||
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
SE | 02.05.2018 | ||
BG | 02.08.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 02.05.2018 | |
LT | 02.05.2018 | ||
NO | 02.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE20120112U (SALICE ARTURO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1,3-7,10,11 * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 2; figures 1, 2, 5, 9-13 *; | [XYI]EP1700985 (RIOJA CALVO MIGUEL ANGEL [ES]) [X] 2,8 * paragraphs [0013] , [0033] , [0038] , [0039]; figures 1,9,12-14,19,20 * [Y] 1,5-7,10,11 [I] 9; | [Y]DE2048950 (ISCHEBECK FA C [DE]) [Y] 3,4 * page 1, line 1 - line 4; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE20315124U (HETTICH HEINZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047]; figures 3-8 *; | [A]DE10301121 (KROGULL JOHANNES [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE10261591 (GRASS GMBH HOECHST [AT]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE102007009076 (WEBER & CO GMBH KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]DE102006058639 (ZIMMER GUENTHER [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | Examination | DE20120112U | Opposition | WO2008101582 | TWM333835U | EP1700985 | DE10261591 | DE102006058639 | DE20120112U | DE2048950 | DE10301121 | DE102007009076 | DE20315124U | DE102007059575 | EP1426535 | DE9420920U | DE9013161U |