Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3242279

EP3242279 - MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bölgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
[2017/45]
Inventor(s)01 / KIRISKEN, Barbaros
c/o Vestel Elektronik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.S.
Organize Sanayi Bolgesi
45030 Manisa / TR
 [2017/45]
Representative(s)Ascherl, Andreas , et al
KEHL, ASCHERL, LIEBHOFF & ETTMAYR
Patentanwälte - Partnerschaft
Emil-Riedel-Strasse 18
80538 München / DE
[2017/45]
Application number, filing date16168550.806.05.2016
[2017/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3242279
Date:08.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3242279
Date:18.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:G08B21/22
[2017/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/45]
TitleGerman:ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2017/45]
English:MONITORING SYSTEM AND METHOD[2017/45]
French:SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE SUPERVISION[2017/45]
Examination procedure06.05.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/45]
20.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2018Fee for grant paid
17.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)23.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/23]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AL18.07.2018
AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RS18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
NO18.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT18.07.2018
NL18.07.2018
Former [2019/04]NL18.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2013103782  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * figures 1,5 * * paragraphs [0064] , [0069] , [0074] *;
 [A]US2015061864  (BUCK JR JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] *;
 [A]WO2013103776  (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * paragraph [0006] *;
 [A]US2011133937  (BUCK JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] *;
 [A]US2016110987  (HUGHES LINDA [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0028] *;
 [A]US5461390  (HOSHEN JOSEPH [US]) [A] 1-12 * figure 5 * * abstract *
by applicantUS8493219