Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3093702

EP3093702 - HINGE FOR ARTICULATING A TEMPLE TO A FRONT OF A FRAME FOR EYEGLASSES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.05.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, FR
published on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Silcon Plastic S.r.l.
Zona Industriale, 2
32012 Val Di Zoldo (BO) / IT
[2017/24]
Former [2016/46]For all designated states
Silcon Plastic S.R.L.
Zona Industriale, 2
32012 Forno di Zoldo (BL) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / COSTANTIN, Arcangelo
Via Siepi, 9
32012 Forno di Zoldo (BL) / IT
02 / BATTISTIN, Pietro
Via Borgo Vader, 21
32012 Forno di Zoldo, Frazione Dont (BL) / IT
 [2017/44]
Former [2016/46]01 / COSTANTIN, Arcangelo
VIA SIEPI, 9
32012 FORNO DI ZOLDO BL / IT
02 / BATTISTIN, Pietro
VIA BORGO VADER, 21
32012 FORNO DI ZOLDO, FRAZIONE DONT BL / IT
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/46]
Application number, filing date16168554.006.05.2016
[2016/46]
Priority number, dateIT2015PD0009915.05.2015         Original published format: IT PD20150099
[2016/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3093702
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3093702
Date:01.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:G02C5/22, G02C5/14, G02C5/10
[2016/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/02]
Former [2016/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SCHARNIER ZUR GELENKIGEN VERBINDUNG EINES BÜGELS AN DIE VORDERSEITE EINES BRILLENGESTELLS[2016/46]
English:HINGE FOR ARTICULATING A TEMPLE TO A FRONT OF A FRAME FOR EYEGLASSES[2016/46]
French:CHARNIÈRE POUR ARTICULER UNE BRANCHE À L'AVANT D'UNE MONTURE DE LUNETTES[2016/46]
Examination procedure06.05.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/02]
15.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.09.2017Fee for grant paid
18.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
IE06.05.2018
LU06.05.2018
BE31.05.2018
FR31.05.2018
[2019/23]
Former [2019/19]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
IE06.05.2018
LU06.05.2018
Former [2019/17]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
LU06.05.2018
Former [2019/06]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]AT01.11.2017
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]AT01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/23]AT01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2997769  (MARIUS MOREL FRANCE SAS [FR]) [A] 1-11 * figures 2a-4a, 7a-7f *;
 [A]WO2009062381  (ARTS OPTICAL COMPANY LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-11 * figures 3, 4a, 4b *;
 [A]EP1184709  (M M EVOLUTION S R L [IT]) [A] 1-11 * figures 4-7 *;
 [A]EP2390710  (CHARMANT CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0055]; figure 15 *;
 [A]JP2003156717  (FOO SYSTEM KK) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0008]; figures 2-4 *;
 [A]US2098921  (LEE MANDAVILLE GURNEY) [A] 1-11 * figures 5-7 * * page 1, column Left, line 4 - page 2, column Right, line 10 *;
 [A]US6883914  (YANG SHUN-TIEN [TW]) [A] 1-11 * figures 4, 6, 7 *