Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3093579

EP3093579 - CONDENSING BOILER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  04.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip20.10.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.11.2017  [2017/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
I.C.I. CALDAIE S.p.A.
Via Giovanni Pascoli, 38
37059 Campagnola-Zevio
37059 Zevio, Frazione Campagnola (VR) / IT
[2016/46]
Inventor(s)01 / PISANI, Giovanni
VIA SOTTOCASTELLO, 76/E
37142 VERONA / IT
 [2016/46]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/46]
Application number, filing date16168903.910.05.2016
[2016/46]
Priority number, dateIT2015VR0008112.05.2015         Original published format: IT VR20150081
[2016/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3093579
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:F24H9/00, F24H9/12, F24H1/26, F24H1/44, F24H1/28
[2016/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KONDENSATIONSKOCHVORRICHTUNG[2016/46]
English:CONDENSING BOILER[2016/46]
French:CHAUDIÈRE À CONDENSATION[2016/46]
Examination procedure17.05.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/47]
04.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2017/47]
Cited inInternational search[IA]EP1899654  (VIESSMANN WERKE KG [DE]) [I] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * [A] 7,8
 [IA]FR2565334  (DELEAGE SA [FR]) [I] 1-6,9,10 * abstract * [A] 7,8
 [A]DE3413968  (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]; SEILER GMBH ING BUERO [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *