Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3243895

EP3243895 - CLEANING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.02.2018
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 28.08.2019  [2019/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2017/46]
Inventor(s)01 / EASTLAND, Shanae Elizabeth
Brussels Innovation Centre
Temselaan 100
Strombeek-bever
B-1853 Brussels / BE
02 / IGLESIAS, Claire Emeline
Brussels Innovation Centre
Temselaan 100
Strombeek-bever
B-1853 Brussels / BE
 [2017/46]
Representative(s)Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir
N.V. Procter & Gamble
Services Company S.A.
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
[N/P]
Former [2017/46]Kellenberger, Jakob
NV Procter & Gamble
Services Company S.A.
Intellectual Property Department
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date16169563.013.05.2016
[2017/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3243895
Date:15.11.2017
Language:EN
[2017/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:C11D1/94, C11D3/33
[2017/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/11]
Former [2017/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:REINIGUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG[2017/46]
English:CLEANING COMPOSITION[2017/46]
French:COMPOSITION DE NETTOYAGE[2017/46]
Examination procedure13.05.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2018Examination requested  [2018/11]
23.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.09.2019
11.04.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/35]
21.04.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/35]
24.09.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[YD]EP2264138  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0004] , [0013] , [0017] , [0018] , [0 33] - [0048] - [0055] , [0064] , [0069]; examples 1,7,10,11,18 *;
 [IY]EP2264136  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0014] , [0017] , [0018] , [0 25] , [0 29] - [0035] - [0041] , [0048] , [0053] , [0056]; examples 4,16 * [Y] 1-15;
 [IY]US2012246852  (SMITH III EDWARD DEWEY [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0008] , [0084] - [0087] - [0096] - [0106] - [0131] , [0132] , [0134] , [0135] - [0137]; example 12 * [Y] 1-15
by applicantEP2264138
 WO9905243
 WO9905242
 WO9905244
 WO9905082
 WO9905084
 WO9905241
 WO9907656
 WO0023549
 WO0023548
 US4704233
 US3915903
    - ROBERT LAUGHLIN, The Aqueous Phase Behaviour of Surfactants, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1994), pages 538 - 542