Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3075402

EP3075402 - ANATOMIC FIT OF A PERCUTANEOUS VAD FOR RIGHT HEART SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.08.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
12.07.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Abiomed, Inc.
22 Cherry Hill Drive
Danvers, MA 01923 / US
[N/P]
Former [2016/40]For all designated states
Abiomed, Inc.
22 Cherry Hill Drive
Danvers, Massachusetts 01923 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CORBETT, Scott C.
20 Prospect Street
Beverly, Massachusetts 01915 / US
 [2016/40]
Representative(s)Höhfeld, Jochen , et al
Klunker IP
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/40]Pisani, Diana Jean , et al
Ropes & Gray International LLP
60 Ludgate Hill
London EC4M 7AW / GB
Application number, filing date16170029.925.05.2011
[2016/40]
Priority number, dateUS20100396344P26.05.2010         Original published format: US 396344 P
[2016/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3075402
Date:05.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/10
[2016/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/40]
TitleGerman:ANATOMISCHE ANPASSUNG EINES PERKUTANEN VAD FÜR RECHTSSEITIGE HERZUNTERSTÜTZUNG[2016/40]
English:ANATOMIC FIT OF A PERCUTANEOUS VAD FOR RIGHT HEART SUPPORT[2016/40]
French:AJUSTEMENT ANATOMIQUE D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ACCÈS VEINEUX PERCUTANÉ POUR LE SUPPORT DU COEUR DROIT[2016/40]
Examination procedure27.05.2016Examination requested  [2016/40]
19.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
16.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.08.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.02.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.02.2019
15.02.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.07.2019Fee for grant paid
10.07.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11725255.1  / EP2575921
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
16.06.2017Request for further processing filed
16.06.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.06.2017Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
16.06.2017Request for further processing filed
16.06.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.06.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.05.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201707   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005234288  (ABOUL-HOSN WALID N [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13 * paragraphs [0017] , [0059] *;
 [X]WO2005037345  (UNIV VANDERBILT [US], et al) [X] 1-6,10-13 * page 7, line 12 - line 28; figure 1 *;
 [A]US6726696  (HOUSER RUSSELL A [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * paragraphs [0085] , [0151] *;
 [YA]US2009005725  (SHOREY FREDERICK A [US]) [Y] 14,15 * paragraph [0051] * [A] 1
 [YA]  - DRUMMOND, ARIELLE, "Three-Dimensional Virtual Anatomic Fit Study for an Implantable Pediatric Ventricular Assist Device", COMPUTATIONAL SCIENCE ICCS 2006 LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 3994, doi:10.1007/11758549_114, pages 855 - 861, XP002657989 [Y] 14,15 * abstract * * sections 2.1 and 2.7 page 860, first and second paragraph * [A] 1

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/11758549_114
by applicantUS2007066943