Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3104075

EP3104075 - ELECTROMECHANICAL ADAPTER FOR ELECTRIFIED TRACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
A.A.G. Stucchi S.r.l.
Via IV Novembre 30/32
23854 Olginate / IT
[2016/50]
Inventor(s)01 / STUCCHI, Aristide
VIA SALERNO, 4
23900 LECCO / IT
 [2016/50]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/50]
Application number, filing date16170093.518.05.2016
[2016/50]
Priority number, dateIT2015UB0113608.06.2015         Original published format: IT UB20151136
[2016/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3104075
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3104075
Date:05.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.10.2016
ClassificationInternational:F21V21/35, F21V23/02, H01R25/14
[2016/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/28]
Former [2016/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ELEKTROMECHANISCHER ADAPTER FÜR ELEKTRIFIZIERTE SPUREN[2016/50]
English:ELECTROMECHANICAL ADAPTER FOR ELECTRIFIED TRACKS[2016/50]
French:ADAPTATEUR ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE POUR RAILS ÉLECTRIFIÉS[2016/50]
Examination procedure18.05.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
31.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2017Examination requested  [2017/28]
08.03.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.07.2018Fee for grant paid
17.07.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SI05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
[2019/37]
Former [2019/34]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
DK05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
SM05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
PT05.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL05.09.2018
AT05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
EE05.09.2018
ES05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
SK05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL05.09.2018
CZ05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
PL05.09.2018
RO05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
IT05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
IS05.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
NL05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL05.09.2018
HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
LV05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/11]HR05.09.2018
LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/10]LT05.09.2018
RS05.09.2018
SE05.09.2018
BG05.12.2018
NO05.12.2018
GR06.12.2018
Former [2019/08]LT05.09.2018
NO05.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT05.09.2018