Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3104673

EP3104673 - AIR CONDITIONING ASSEMBLY FOR SERVER ROOMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.08.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vertiv S.R.L.
Via Leonardo da Vinci, 16-18
35028 Piove di Sacco (PD) / IT
[2018/03]
Former [2016/50]For all designated states
Emerson Network Power S.R.L.
Via Leonardo da Vinci, 16-18
35028 Piove di Sacco (PD) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / GOBBO, Maurizio
Via Borgo Padova, 17/A
35028 PIOVE DI SACCO PD / IT
02 / POLO, Fabio
Via Volta, 34
30010 CAMPOLONGO MAGGIORE VE / IT
 [2016/50]
Representative(s)Modiano, Micaela Nadia , et al
Modiano & Partners
Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[2016/50]
Application number, filing date16171699.827.05.2016
[2016/50]
Priority number, dateIT2015UB0090029.05.2015         Original published format: IT UB20150900
[2016/50]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3104673
Date:14.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:H05K7/20, G05D23/19, F24F11/00
[2016/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
Former [2016/50]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KLIMAANLAGENANORDNUNG FÜR SERVERRÄUME[2016/50]
English:AIR CONDITIONING ASSEMBLY FOR SERVER ROOMS[2016/50]
French:ENSEMBLE DE CONDITIONNEMENT D'AIR POUR SALLES DE SERVEURS[2016/50]
Examination procedure27.05.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
07.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/29]
14.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
28.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2010286843  (LYON GEOFF SEAN [CA]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0023] - [0025] - [0 32] , [0 33] , [0 41] , [0 88] - [0090] - [ 100] , [ 101] , [ 103] - [0109]; figure 1 * [I] 4,5;
 [XI]JP2009193247  (HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0 29] , [0 32] - [0037] * [I] 5