Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3109610

EP3109610 - TRANSMISSION FOR SMALL AND MINIATURE DRIVE WITH TORQUE MEASURING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.08.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.04.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  07.07.2017
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 09.10.2019  [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr. Fritz Faulhaber GmbH & Co. KG
Daimlerstr. 23/25
71101 Schönaich / DE
[2016/52]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHWENKER, Frank
Limburgstr. 29
73230 Kirchheim unter Teck / DE
 [2016/52]
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
42103 Wuppertal / DE
[2016/52]
Application number, filing date16172064.431.05.2016
[2016/52]
Priority number, dateDE20151011035326.06.2015         Original published format: DE102015110353
[2016/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3109610
Date:28.12.2016
Language:DE
[2016/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3109610
Date:09.10.2019
Language:DE
[2019/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2016
ClassificationInternational:F16H1/28, G01L5/24, G01L3/10
[2019/12]
Former International [2016/52]G01L5/24, G01L3/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/32]
Former [2016/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:GETRIEBE FÜR KLEIN- UND KLEINSTANTRIEB MIT DREHMOMENTMESSGLIED[2016/52]
English:TRANSMISSION FOR SMALL AND MINIATURE DRIVE WITH TORQUE MEASURING MEMBER[2016/52]
French:ENGRENAGE POUR PETIT ENTRAINEMENT COMPRENANT UN DISPOSITIF DE MESURE DE COUPLE[2016/52]
Examination procedure31.05.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.06.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.06.2017Examination requested  [2017/32]
09.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.07.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
23.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2019Fee for grant paid
29.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
31.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[YA]EP1719991  (ONO SOKKI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,6-12,15,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] , [0009] - [0014] - [0022] - [0028] - [0035] - [0039] - [0073] - [0077] * [A] 5,13,14,17;
 [YA]US6694828  (NICOT CHRISTOPHE [FR]) [Y] 1-4,6-12,15,16 * the whole document * [A] 5,13,14,17
by applicantDE102006057539