EP3106959 - DRONE COMPRISING IMPROVED MEANS TO COMPENSATE FOR THE BIAS OF THE INERTIAL UNIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parrot Drones 174-178 quai de Jemmapes 75010 Paris / FR | [2016/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUADRAT, Quentin 192 rue de Paris 93260 Les Lilas / FR | 02 /
CHAPERON, Cédric 32 avenue Mathurin Moreau App 132 75019 Paris / FR | 03 /
SEYDOUX, Henri 99 rue de Courcelles 75017 Paris / FR | [2016/51] | Representative(s) | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique Bardehle Pagenberg SPE SAS SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/13] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique Bardehle Pagenberg SO Square Opéra 5, rue Boudreau 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2016/51] | Dupuis-Latour, Dominique Bardehle Pagenberg 10, boulevard Haussmann 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16173188.0 | 06.06.2016 | [2016/51] | Priority number, date | FR20150055455 | 16.06.2015 Original published format: FR 1555455 | [2016/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3106959 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3106959 | Date: | 25.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/19, G01C21/16 | [2019/45] | CPC: |
G05D23/1919 (EP,US);
G05D23/20 (CN);
G01P21/00 (US);
B64C39/024 (US);
B64U10/00 (EP,CN);
B64U20/83 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2016/51] | G05D23/19 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] |
Former [2016/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DROHNE, DIE PERFEKTIONIERTE MITTEL ZUR KOMPENSATION DER VERZERRUNG DES TRÄGHEITSNAVIGATIONSSYSTEMS IN ABHÄNGIGKEIT VON DER TEMPERATUR UMFASST | [2016/51] | English: | DRONE COMPRISING IMPROVED MEANS TO COMPENSATE FOR THE BIAS OF THE INERTIAL UNIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEMPERATURE | [2016/51] | French: | DRONE COMPORTANT DES MOYENS PERFECTIONNÉS DE COMPENSATION DU BIAIS DE LA CENTRALE INERTIELLE EN FONCTION DE LA TEMPÉRATURE | [2016/51] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 07.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2016 | AL | 25.03.2020 | AT | 25.03.2020 | CY | 25.03.2020 | CZ | 25.03.2020 | DK | 25.03.2020 | EE | 25.03.2020 | ES | 25.03.2020 | FI | 25.03.2020 | HR | 25.03.2020 | IT | 25.03.2020 | LT | 25.03.2020 | LV | 25.03.2020 | MC | 25.03.2020 | MK | 25.03.2020 | MT | 25.03.2020 | NL | 25.03.2020 | PL | 25.03.2020 | RO | 25.03.2020 | RS | 25.03.2020 | SE | 25.03.2020 | SI | 25.03.2020 | SK | 25.03.2020 | SM | 25.03.2020 | TR | 25.03.2020 | IE | 06.06.2020 | LU | 06.06.2020 | BG | 25.06.2020 | NO | 25.06.2020 | GR | 26.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | IS | 25.07.2020 | PT | 18.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 06.06.2016 | |
AL | 25.03.2020 | ||
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.06.2016 | |
AT | 25.03.2020 | ||
CY | 25.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
MT | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
TR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SI | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
PL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 25.03.2020 | |
CZ | 25.03.2020 | ||
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
IT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
MC | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
DK | 25.03.2020 | ||
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
ES | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
EE | 25.03.2020 | ||
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 25.03.2020 | |
FI | 25.03.2020 | ||
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SK | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RO | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
SM | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
PT | 18.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LT | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
IS | 25.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
NL | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
BG | 25.06.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
GR | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
HR | 25.03.2020 | ||
LV | 25.03.2020 | ||
RS | 25.03.2020 | ||
SE | 25.03.2020 | ||
NO | 25.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 25.03.2020 | |
NO | 25.06.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2644240 (PARROT [FR]) [A] 1-11* the whole document *; | [YA] - LUCA PETRICCA ET AL, "Design, fabrication and test of an embedded lightweight kinematic autopilot (ELKA)", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INTELLIGENT UNMANNED SYSTEMS, (20140506), vol. 2, no. 2, doi:10.1108/IJIUS-10-2013-0022, ISSN 2049-6427, pages 140 - 150, XP055267913 [Y] 1,7 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1108/IJIUS-10-2013-0022 | [YA] - KIM J D ET AL, "Efficient control system for PCR chips", MICROFLUIDICS, BIOMEMS, AND MEDICAL MICROSYSTEMS IX, SPIE, 1000 20TH ST. BELLINGHAM WA 98225-6705 USA, (20110210), vol. 7929, no. 1, doi:10.1117/12.873572, pages 1 - 9, XP060011017 [Y] 1,7 * the whole document * [A] 2-6,8-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.873572 | by applicant | EP2364757 | EP2400460 | EP2613213 | EP2613214 | EP2644240 | - L PETRICCIA ET AL., "Design, fabrication and test of an embedded lightweight kinematic autopilot (ELKA", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF INTELLIGENT UNMANNED SYSTEMS, (201405), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1108/IJIUS-10-2013-0022, pages 140 - 150, XP055267913 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1108/IJIUS-10-2013-0022 | - X. NIU ET AL., "Fast Thermal Calibration of Low-Grade Inertial Sensors and Inertial Measurements Units", SENSORS, (2013), vol. 13, pages 12192 - 12217 | - KIM ET AL., "Efficient Control Systems for PCR Chips", MICROFLUIDICS, BIOMEMS AND MEDICAL MICROSYSTEMS IX, PUBLIé DANS LES PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (201102), vol. 7929, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1117/12.873572, pages 1 - 9, XP060011017 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.873572 |